RODDY v. RTI INTERNATIONAL

Plaintiff: MARK ALLEN RODDY
Defendant: RTI INTERNATIONAL
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
0 Judge: L PATRICK AULD
1 Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARLA N. PRESLEY on behalf of Defendant RTI INTERNATIONAL (PRESLEY, MARLA)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Appointing KENNETH P. CARLSON, JR., as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl)
February 25, 2019 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Mediation due by 7/30/2019. (Gammon, Cheryl)
February 25, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. (Gammon, Cheryl)
February 22, 2019 Set Scheduling Order Deadlines per 2/22/2019 Text Order: Discovery shall be placed on a case-management track designated in LR 26.1(a) as Complex. Discovery due by 10/25/2019. Mediation should be conducted toward the beginning or mid-way through the discovery period, the exact date to be set by the mediator after consultation with the parties. The parties agree that the mediator shall be Ken Carlson. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2019. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/25/2019. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 4/15/2019. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 5/15/2019. The parties do not consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. A jury trial has been demanded. If the case is ultimately tried, trial is expected to take approximately four (4) days. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 22, 2019 TEXT ORDER adopting #18 Joint Proposed Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan with the following clarifications: (1) notwithstanding the reference in Paragraph 1(b) to a need for discovery of "all other matters that will reasonably lead to the discovery of admissible evidence," the limitations on the scope of discovery in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(b)(1) remain in force in this case; and (2) the Clerk shall set this case for trial based on the standard considerations, which do not include a guarantee of a ruling on any dispositive motions prior to the trial date. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 02/22/2019. (AULD, L.)
February 21, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #18 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
February 21, 2019 Filing 18 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by RTI INTERNATIONAL.(KAZAGLIS, TED)
February 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JENNIFER LEAH BILLS on behalf of Plaintiff MARK ALLEN RODDY (BILLS, JENNIFER) (Main Document 17 replaced on 2/20/2019) (Sheets, Jamie).
January 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 2/25/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by RTI INTERNATIONAL. (KAZAGLIS, TED)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TED N. KAZAGLIS on behalf of Defendant RTI INTERNATIONAL (KAZAGLIS, TED)
January 7, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney Joseph C. Korsak. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 2/6/2019. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 4:18-cv-01710. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #4 Defendant's motion to dismiss is denied; #4 Defendant's motion to transfer is granted and this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/7/19. (case closed)(lg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/7/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue filed by RTI International. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/7/19. (lg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/7/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina filed by RTI International.(Presley, Marla) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/7/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina filed by Mark Allen Roddy.(Korsak, Joseph) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/7/2019.]
November 19, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised the Answer to Statement of Facts (doc. 7) should be refiled as a Brief in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss. Once refiled, the doc. 7 will be deleted. (ch1) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/7/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS re #5 Brief in Support, #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina filed by Mark Allen Roddy. (Attachments: #1 Memo BRIEF, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Proposed Order)(Korsak, Joseph) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/7/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Mark Allen Roddy. (Korsak, Joseph) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/7/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina filed by RTI International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(Presley, Marla) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/7/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina by RTI International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Proposed Order)(Presley, Marla) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/7/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/5/2018. (jr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/7/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to RTI International and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/7/2019.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RTI International ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4528664), filed by Mark Allen Roddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODDY v. RTI INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK ALLEN RODDY
Represented By: JOSEPH C. KORSAK
Represented By: JENNIFER LEAH BILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTI INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: MARLA N. PRESLEY
Represented By: TED N. KAZAGLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?