NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC. and HORIZON HOBBY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00111
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (BANKS, FLOYD) Modified on 4/24/2020 to correct title - incorrect event type used. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 25, 2020 Case Reported Settled Prior To Mediation (Gammon, Cheryl)
March 25, 2020 Case Reported Settled - Stipulation of Dismissal due by 4/25/2020. (Gammon, Cheryl)
March 23, 2020 Filing 22 REPORT OF MEDIATOR from Raymond E. Owens, Jr. - Mediation not held. Settled prior to mediation. (Gammon, Cheryl)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing: Master Trial Calendar: OCTOBER Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Unassigned Courtroom. Trial briefs, etc. deadline set for 9/14/2020. (Blay, Debbie)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(BANKS, FLOYD)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Appointing RAYMOND E. OWENS, JR.,as the mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl)
May 30, 2019 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Selection of Mediator due by 6/25/2019. Mediation due by 3/15/2020. (Gammon, Cheryl)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING AMENDED JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT without modification, signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 5/21/2019; Discovery shall be placed on a case management track designated in LR 26.1(a) as Complex. Discovery due by 3/15/2020. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2019. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2019. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 8/1/2019. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 9/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2020. The Parties do not consent to a Magistrate Judge. Trial of the action is expected to take approximately four days. (Sheets, Jamie)
May 20, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #17 Amended Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (BANKS, FLOYD)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(BANKS, FLOYD) Modified on 5/17/2019 requested amended report with case management track (Garrett, Kim).
May 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Rescheduling: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 5/29/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 5/22/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC.. (ALLEN, MICHAEL)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint (with Plaintiff's Consent) by COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ALLEN, MICHAEL)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC. Answer due by 4/3/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 02/22/2019. (Brubaker, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant, filed by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (BANKS, FLOYD) Modified on 2/11/2019 to edit text. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) HORIZON HOBBY, LLC, filed by Plaintiff NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (BANKS, FLOYD)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney FLOYD DOUGLAS BANKS on behalf of Plaintiff NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (BANKS, FLOYD)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC.. (JOHNSON, KARI)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, (with Plaintiff's Consent) by COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JOHNSON, KARI)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC. Answer due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 1/24/2019 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KARI R. JOHNSON on behalf of Defendant COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC. (JOHNSON, KARI)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL CALLAIS ALLEN on behalf of Defendant COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC. (ALLEN, MICHAEL)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC., HORIZON HOBBY, LLC. (Original document filed in Cabarrus County Superior Court, case number 18CV3805, issued on 12/7/2018. Docketed as Exhibit 1 to #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC., HORIZON HOBBY, LLC, filed by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Original document filed in Cabarrus County Superior Court, case number 18CV3805. Docketed as Exhibit 1 to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Judith Cook, Horizon Hobby, LLC, NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2496864.), filed by Common Sense Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Civil Summons & Complaint - Cabarrus County 18CVS3805), #2 Exhibit 2 (Cabarrus County Notice of Removal))(ALLEN, MICHAEL)
January 23, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
January 23, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: FLOYD DOUGLAS BANKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMON SENSE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL CALLAIS ALLEN
Represented By: KARI R. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HORIZON HOBBY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?