BLAINE v. JORDAN
Plaintiff: LAUREN BLAINE
Defendant: LENAIR JORDAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00142
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 03/25/2019 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation, that this action is remanded to the Cabarrus County District Court for lack of federal subject-matter jurisdiction. (Garland, Leah)
March 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED RE: #6 Recommended Ruling to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Sanders, Marlene)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 2/26/2019. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 3/1/2019. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 02/12/2019. It is ORDERED that Defendant's application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted for the limited purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. It is RECOMMENDED that this case be remanded to the Cabarrus County District Court, North Carolina, for lack of federal subject-matter jurisdiction. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 1, 2019 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 1, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LENAIR JORDAN. (Original document issued in Cabarrus County District Court on 12/18/2018 in case number 18CVM3796) (Coyne, Michelle)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT entitled "Eviction Notice" against LENAIR JORDAN, filed by LAUREN BLAINE. (Originally filed in Cabarrus Court District Court, case Number 18CVM3796)(Coyne, Michelle)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against LAUREN BLAINE, filed by LENAIR JORDAN. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal to State Court)(Coyne, Michelle)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by LENAIR JORDAN. (Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLAINE v. JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN BLAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LENAIR JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?