SPENCER SPIRIT HOLDINGS, INC. v. SUNRISE ROOFING, INC., et al
Plaintiff: SPENCER SPIRIT HOLDINGS, INC.
Defendant: SUNRISE ROOFING, INC. and S.A. ALSAN & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00195
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 4/15/2019; that, for good cause shown, Plaintiff's Consent Motion [Doc. #13 ] is GRANTED, and that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina (Charlotte Division). (Sheets, Jamie)
April 12, 2019 Motions Submitted: #13 Consent MOTION to Change Venue to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. (Winchester, Robin)
April 9, 2019 Case Reassigned to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. UNASSIGNED no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against SUNRISE ROOFING, INC. by S.A. ALSAN & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (COADA, DIANA)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Change Venue by SPENCER SPIRIT HOLDINGS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 4/18/2019 (NALIBOTSKY, ALBERT)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant S.A. ALSAN & ASSOCIATES, INC. by S.A. ALSAN & ASSOCIATES, INC..(COADA, DIANA)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for SUNRISE ROOFING, INC. Answer due by 4/22/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 03/14/2019. (Brubaker, John)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SUNRISE ROOFING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KEISTER, JEFFREY)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUNRISE ROOFING, INC.. (KEISTER, JEFFREY)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JEFFREY D. KEISTER on behalf of Defendant SUNRISE ROOFING, INC. (KEISTER, JEFFREY)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for S.A. ALSAN & ASSOCIATES, INC. Answer due by 4/8/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 3/12/2019. (Brubaker, John)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by S.A. ALSAN & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COADA, DIANA)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DIANA COADA on behalf of Defendant S.A. ALSAN & ASSOCIATES, INC. (COADA, DIANA)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail, Restricted Delivery, Return Receipt Requested as to S.A. ALSAN & ASSOCIATES, INC. served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (NALIBOTSKY, ALBERT)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested/Restriced Delivery as to SUNRISE ROOFING, INC. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (NALIBOTSKY, ALBERT)
February 21, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 21, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to S.A. ALSAN & ASSOCIATES, INC., SUNRISE ROOFING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Sunrise)(Coyne, Michelle)
February 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spencer Spirit Holdings, Inc.. (NALIBOTSKY, ALBERT)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2514863.), filed by Spencer Spirit Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(NALIBOTSKY, ALBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPENCER SPIRIT HOLDINGS, INC. v. SUNRISE ROOFING, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE ROOFING, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY D. KEISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.A. ALSAN & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: DIANA COADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPENCER SPIRIT HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: ALBERT S. NALIBOTSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?