HOWARD v. ADAMS FARM LIVING AND REHABILITATION

Plaintiff: BELINDA HOWARD
Defendant: ADAMS FARM LIVING AND REHABILITATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00240
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 CASE REFERRED RE: #4 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE, #6 Objection to Recommended Ruling to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
April 24, 2019 CASE REFERRED RE: #4 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE, #6 Objection to Recommended Ruling to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Sanders, Marlene)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION TO RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #4 Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge, by Plaintiff BELINDA HOWARD entitled "NATURE OF THE MATTER BEFORE THE COURT". Response to Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2019. (Butler, Carol)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Mailing Memorandum Opinion, Order and Recommendation. Objections due by 4/19/2019. Objections for Pro Se due by 4/22/2019. (Daniel, J)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION , signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 4/4/2019, that the obvious lack of subject matter jurisdiction renders this action legally frivolous in this Court, that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Docket Entry #1 ) is GRANTED for the limited purpose of considering this recommendation of dismissal. RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Butler, Carol)
March 1, 2019 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Garland, Leah)
March 1, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garland, Leah)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Garland, Leah)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ADAMS FARM LIVING AND REHABILITATION, filed by BELINDA HOWARD. (Garland, Leah)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by BELINDA HOWARD. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOWARD v. ADAMS FARM LIVING AND REHABILITATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAMS FARM LIVING AND REHABILITATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELINDA HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?