THE ESTATE OF NAJEE ALI BAKER v. WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY, et al
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF NAJEE ALI BAKER
Defendant: JOHN DOE RHINO SECURITY STAFF 1-2, JOHN DOE, THE PI OMICRON CHAPTER OF DELTA SIGMA THETA SORORITY, INC., RHINO SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC and WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00477
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAY HARDIN FERGUSON on behalf of Plaintiff THE ESTATE OF NAJEE ALI BAKER (FERGUSON, JAY)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 DEFENDANT RHINO SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by RHINO SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC. (LAWRENCE, STEVEN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY filed by WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY. (FULTON, SHANA)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY. Response to Motion due by 7/24/2019 (FULTON, SHANA)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEVEN C. LAWRENCE on behalf of Defendant RHINO SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC (LAWRENCE, STEVEN)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SHANA L. FULTON on behalf of Defendant WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY (FULTON, SHANA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT JAMES KING, III on behalf of Defendant WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY (KING, ROBERT)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by THE ESTATE OF NAJEE ALI BAKER. RHINO SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (FAZZOLA, JONATHON)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by THE ESTATE OF NAJEE ALI BAKER. WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (FAZZOLA, JONATHON)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
May 8, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 8, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHON N. FAZZOLA on behalf of Plaintiff THE ESTATE OF NAJEE ALI BAKER (FAZZOLA, JONATHON)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing Fee of $400.00 paid. Receipt number: 0418-2564264) against All Defendants, filed by Estate of Najee Ali Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FAZZOLA, JONATHON) Modified on 5/7/2019 to add in payment information. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE ESTATE OF NAJEE ALI BAKER v. WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE RHINO SECURITY STAFF 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PI OMICRON CHAPTER OF DELTA SIGMA THETA SORORITY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHINO SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN C. LAWRENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY
Represented By: ROBERT JAMES KING, III
Represented By: SHANA L. FULTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF NAJEE ALI BAKER
Represented By: JONATHON N. FAZZOLA
Represented By: JAY HARDIN FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?