TRIANGLE GRADING & PAVING, INC. v. RHINO SERVICES, LLC, et al.

Plaintiff: TRIANGLE GRADING & PAVING, LLC
Defendant: RHINO SERVICES, LLC and LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00486
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Motion Submitted: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. (Welch, Kelly)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY, filed by Defendants LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE, RHINO SERVICES, LLC, to Response to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE, RHINO SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - GDOT Contract)(RAINEY, MICHAEL)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed by Plaintiff TRIANGLE GRADING & PAVING, LLC re #10 Corrected Document filed by TRIANGLE GRADING & PAVING, LLC. Replies due by 6/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard Brockman, #2 Affidavit of R Gray Kirkpatrick, Jr, #3 Affidavit of Adrian D Bailey, #4 Affidavit of Rebecca Pugh)(WOLF, WILLIAM)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MEGHAN PIELER on behalf of Defendants LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE, RHINO SERVICES, LLC (PIELER, MEGHAN)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER S. ANULEWICZ on behalf of Defendants LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE, RHINO SERVICES, LLC (ANULEWICZ, CHRISTOPHER)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 Corrected document re #9 BRIEF re: #8 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Affidavit of Lonnie Blackstone)(RAINEY, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/17/2019 to correct docket entry relationships. (Garland, Leah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE, RHINO SERVICES, LLC filed by LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE, RHINO SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Lonnie Blackstone)(RAINEY, MICHAEL)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE, RHINO SERVICES, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Lonnie Blackstone)(RAINEY, MICHAEL)
May 10, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE, RHINO SERVICES, LLC. Original document issued in Alamance County Superior Court on 04/10/2019 in Case Number 19CVS755 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition to Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE, RHINO SERVICES, LLC, filed by TRIANGLE GRADING & PAVING, LLC. (Original document filed in Alamance County Spuerior Court, Case number 19CVS755 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL SCOTT RAINEY on behalf of Defendants LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE, RHINO SERVICES, LLC. (RAINEY, MICHAEL)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE. (RAINEY, MICHAEL)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RHINO SERVICES, LLC. (RAINEY, MICHAEL)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from state court against TRIANGLE GRADING & PAVING, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2567034), filed by LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE, RHINO SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Records of North Carolina Secretary of State Business Registration Division, #3 Exhibit C - Records of Georgia Secretary of State Corporations Division, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Lonnie Blackstone, #5 Exhibit E - Civil Action Cover Sheet )(RAINEY, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRIANGLE GRADING & PAVING, INC. v. RHINO SERVICES, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHINO SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL SCOTT RAINEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. ANULEWICZ
Represented By: MEGHAN PIELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LONNIE STEVEN BLACKSTONE
Represented By: MICHAEL SCOTT RAINEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. ANULEWICZ
Represented By: MEGHAN PIELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRIANGLE GRADING & PAVING, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?