MCKEE v. NORTH CAROLINA AGRICULTURAL AND TECHNICAL STATE UNIVERSITY

Plaintiff: TERRA L. MCKEE
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA AGRICULTURAL AND TECHNICAL STATE UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00498
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 06/12/2019 that the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff forms for filing a Complaint for Employment Discrimination. FURTHER that Plaintiff is given 30 days, until July 12, 2019, to file and Amended Complaint on the proper forms, clarifying her claims and the factual basis for the claims. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint on the proper forms, this case will be dismissed without prejudice.(Coyne, Michelle)
May 14, 2019 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 14, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NORTH CAROLINA AGRICULTURAL AND TECHNICAL STATE UNIVERSITY, filed by TERRA L. MCKEE.(Coyne, Michelle)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by TERRA L. MCKEE. (Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCKEE v. NORTH CAROLINA AGRICULTURAL AND TECHNICAL STATE UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA AGRICULTURAL AND TECHNICAL STATE UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRA L. MCKEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?