TURN AND BANK HOLDINGS, LLC et al v. AVCO CORPORATION, et al

Plaintiff: Turn and Bank Holdings, LLC and Precision Airmotive, LLC
Defendant: AVCO CORPORATION and AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00503
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss STAY, OR TRANSFER filed by AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC. filed by PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC, TURN AND BANK HOLDINGS, LLC. Replies due by 7/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) Order, #2 Exhibit (B) Declaration of Michael Allen, #3 Exhibit (C) Draft Jurisdictional Discovery to AVCO, #4 Exhibit (D) Draft Jurisdictional Discovery to AVStar, #5 Exhibit (E) Draft Subpoena to Textron)(SHORES, ANDREW) (Main Document 32 replaced on 7/8/2019) (Sheets, Jamie).
July 5, 2019 Filing 31 Defendants' BRIEF re #30 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927 by Defendants AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC. filed by AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - June 27-28 email exchange with Matthews, #2 Exhibit 2 - Comparison of PA-ECF 367-1 and ECF No. 6-1)(O'NEILL, M.)
July 5, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927 by AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 7/26/2019 (O'NEILL, M.)
July 5, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC, TURN AND BANK HOLDINGS, LLC filed by AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC.. Replies due by 7/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - June 27-28 email exchange with Matthews, #2 Exhibit 2 - Rupert Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Weaver Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - April 2015 INTA Presentation, #5 Exhibit 5 - FAA Order 8110C)(O'NEILL, M.)
June 25, 2019 Set Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #3. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 6/25/2019; that the defendants' motion to extend time to respond, Doc. #16 , is DENIED to the extent the defendants seek to defer a response to the motion for a preliminary injunction until after the motion to dismiss is resolved. The Court will allow the defendants a short extension until July 5, 2019, to respond to the plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction; the plaintiffs must file any reply brief no later than July 19, 2019. The plaintiffs must file any response to the defendants' motion to dismiss no later than July 5, 2019; any reply brief by the defendants is due 14 days from the date of the plaintiffs' response. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 25, 2019 Motions Submitted: #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
June 25, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY, filed by Defendants AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC., to Response to #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Status Update Letter dated 06-18-2018)(POWELL, BRENT)
June 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion to Expedite. Any reply brief due June 25, 2019 at 11 a.m. Signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on June 23, 2019.(EAGLES, CATHERINE)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JACOB S. WHARTON on behalf of Defendants AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC. (WHARTON, JACOB)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC. filed by PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC, TURN AND BANK HOLDINGS, LLC. Replies due by 7/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Matthews Declaration)(MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 STANDARD ORDER for all civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW R. SHORES on behalf of Plaintiffs PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC, TURN AND BANK HOLDINGS, LLC (SHORES, ANDREW)
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF re Order,, PLAINTIFFS POSITION AND PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Joint Motion re Briefing Schedule)(MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 Defendants' BRIEF Regarding Proposed Briefing Schedule. (POWELL, BRENT)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES: The parties shall immediately confer about a sensible briefing schedule on all pending motions and shall file a joint submission no later than 9:30 a.m. 6/19/19, that includes their proposed schedule. If they cannot agree, each side shall submit a brief limited to 1500 words which sets forth its position as to an appropriate schedule. The parties are advised that the Court is likely to accept a reasonable agreed-upon schedule but should the parties not agree, the court-imposed schedule may not align with either sides proposed schedule. (Sanders, Marlene)
June 17, 2019 Motions Submitted: #17 MOTION to Expedite DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Sanders, Marlene)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT VAN ARNAM on behalf of Plaintiffs PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC, TURN AND BANK HOLDINGS, LLC (VAN ARNAM, ROBERT)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF re #17 MOTION to Expedite DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Defendants AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC. filed by AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC.. (O'NEILL, M.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Expedite DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC.. (O'NEILL, M.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC.. (O'NEILL, M.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Dismiss STAY, OR TRANSFER by Defendants AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC. filed by AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2019-06-14 PACER Docket - AVCO v Turn & Bank USDC MDPA, #2 Exhibit 2018-06-08 T&B and Precision Reply In Support of Motion for Permanent Injunction - MDPA - 371, #3 Exhibit 2018-06-14 Richard Matthews Ltr to Judge Brann - MDPA - 372, #4 Exhibit 2019-06-14 Affidavit of Brian K. Hudson, #5 Exhibit 2018-12-31 NCMD Judicial Caseload Profile)(O'NEILL, M.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss STAY, OR TRANSFER by AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 7/5/2019 (O'NEILL, M.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRENT F. POWELL on behalf of Defendant AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC. (POWELL, BRENT)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRENT F. POWELL on behalf of Defendant AVCO CORPORATION (POWELL, BRENT)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL on behalf of Defendant AVCO CORPORATION (O'NEILL, M.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL on behalf of Defendant AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC. (O'NEILL, M.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TURN AND BANK HOLDINGS, LLC, PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC as to AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC. served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TURN AND BANK HOLDINGS, LLC, PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC as to AVCO CORPORATION served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Hall Declaration, #2 Exhibit B- Grafenauer Declaration, #3 Exhibit C- Memo Order, #4 Exhibit D- Jenkins Declaration, #5 Exhibit E- Youakim Declaration, #6 Exhibit F- Allen Declaration, #7 Exhibit G- Brief in Opp of PI, #8 Exhibit H- Mankad Declaration, #9 Exhibit I- Reconsideration Order, #10 Exhibit J- PI Order, #11 Exhibit K- Mediation Order, #12 Exhibit L- Allen Declaration, #13 Exhibit M- McBride Declaration, #14 Exhibit N- Hicks Declaration, #15 Exhibit O- Allen Declaration)(MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC, TURN AND BANK HOLDINGS, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AVCO CORPORATION, AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for AVSTAR) (Garland, Leah)
May 17, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 17, 2019 Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 400.00. Receipt number: NCM045912. (Garland, Leah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Turn and Bank Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aero Group Holdings LLC for Turn and Bank Holdings, LLC.. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Precision Airmotive, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aero Group Holdings LLC for Precision Airmotive, LLC.. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Turn and Bank Holdings, LLC, Precision Airmotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- TM Registrations, #2 Exhibit B- Photos, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MATTHEWS, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TURN AND BANK HOLDINGS, LLC et al v. AVCO CORPORATION, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO CORPORATION
Represented By: M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL
Represented By: BRENT F. POWELL
Represented By: JACOB S. WHARTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL
Represented By: BRENT F. POWELL
Represented By: JACOB S. WHARTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turn and Bank Holdings, LLC
Represented By: RICHARD T. MATTHEWS
Represented By: ROBERT VAN ARNAM
Represented By: ANDREW R. SHORES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Airmotive, LLC
Represented By: RICHARD T. MATTHEWS
Represented By: ROBERT VAN ARNAM
Represented By: ANDREW R. SHORES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?