BAY VALLEY FOODS, LLC v. GOLDING FARMS FOODS, INC.

Plaintiff: BAY VALLEY FOODS, LLC
Defendant: GOLDING FARMS FOODS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00514
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff BAY VALLEY FOODS, LLC (RIEGER, SARAH)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SARAH E. RIEGER on behalf of Plaintiff BAY VALLEY FOODS, LLC (RIEGER, SARAH)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KADIE M. JELENCHICK on behalf of Plaintiff BAY VALLEY FOODS, LLC (JELENCHICK, KADIE)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BAY VALLEY FOODS, LLC as to GOLDING FARMS FOODS, INC. served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (GERBER, ANDREW)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to GOLDING FARMS FOODS, INC. (Garland, Leah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BENJAMIN FREEDMAN SIDBURY on behalf of Defendant GOLDING FARMS FOODS, INC. (SIDBURY, BENJAMIN)
May 16, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff Bay Valley Foods, LLC (GERBER, ANDREW)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW JAMES GERBER on behalf of Plaintiff Bay Valley Foods, LLC (GERBER, ANDREW)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golding Farms Foods, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Bay Valley Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(GERBER, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAY VALLEY FOODS, LLC v. GOLDING FARMS FOODS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY VALLEY FOODS, LLC
Represented By: ANDREW JAMES GERBER
Represented By: KADIE M. JELENCHICK
Represented By: SARAH E. RIEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDING FARMS FOODS, INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN FREEDMAN SIDBURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?