AMMONS V. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Plaintiff: KIRBY AMMONS
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00547
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Appointing PAUL T. FLICK, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Kemp, Donita)
July 25, 2019 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 5/1/2020.(Kemp, Donita)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 07/25/2019, that the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report [Doc. #8 ] is approved as submitted and as modified herein. Mediation due by 5/1/2020. Parties agree to designate Paul T. Flick as mediator. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 8/30/2019. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 9/30/2019. Discovery shall be placed on a case management track designated in LR 26.1(a)(3) as exceptional. Parties have not agreed to refer the case to a magistrate judge or to appoint a master. The trial of this action is expected to take approximately 5-7 days. A jury trial has been demanded.(Taylor, Abby)
July 12, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #8 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by KIRBY AMMONS. (FRANCIS, DANIEL)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 7/25/2019 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. identifying Corporate Parent CSX CORPORATION for CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC... (STEWART, WILLIAM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (STEWART, WILLIAM)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Marsh, Keah)
May 30, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 29, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT KIRBY AMMONS against CSX Transportation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2577165.), filed by Kirby Carnell Ammons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet NEW FILING COVER SHEET)(FRANCIS, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMMONS V. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRBY AMMONS
Represented By: DANIEL R. FRANCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?