MACREGEN, INC. v. BURNETTE

Plaintiff: MACREGEN, INC.
Defendant: W NEAL BURNETTE, III and W. NEAL BURNETTE, III
Case Number: 1:2019cv00591
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: N C TILLEY
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MACREGEN, INC. re #8 Order on Motion for Entry of Default (DUFFY, PAMELA)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Entry of Default signed by JOHN S. BRUBAKER on 7/11/2019 for failure to appear, plead, or otherwise respond to this action within the time allowed. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF re #6 MOTION for Entry of Default as to W. NEAL BURNETTE, III. (DUFFY, PAMELA) Modified on 7/11/2019 to edit title. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default as to W. NEAL BURNETTE, III, by MACREGEN, INC. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (DUFFY, PAMELA) Modified on 7/11/2019 to correct event type and terminate deadline. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to All Defendants. (DUFFY, PAMELA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to W. NEAL BURNETTE, III. (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
June 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MACREGEN, INC.. (DUFFY, PAMELA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W. NEAL BURNETTE, III (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2589477), filed by MACREGEN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (DUFFY, PAMELA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MACREGEN, INC. v. BURNETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W NEAL BURNETTE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. NEAL BURNETTE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MACREGEN, INC.
Represented By: PAMELA S. DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?