WILLIAMSON v. PRIME SPORTS MARKETING, LLC et al

Plaintiff: ZION WILLIAMSON
Defendant: GINA FORD and PRIME SPORTS MARKETING, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00593
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Answer updated for GINA FORD to 9/16/2019; PRIME SPORTS MARKETING, LLC to 9/16/2019. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 11, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Defendants. For good cause shown, Defendants shall have up to and including September 16, 2019 to Answer, and/or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/11/2019.(Lee, Pedra)
July 8, 2019 Motion Referred: RE: #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, [Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint], to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Blay, Debbie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, [Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint] by ZION WILLIAMSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WESTER, JOHN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ALVIN L. PITTMAN on behalf of Defendants GINA FORD, PRIME SPORTS MARKETING, LLC (PITTMAN, ALVIN)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service (Prime Sports Marketing, LLC), #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service (Gina Ford))(WESTER, JOHN)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JEFFREY S. KLEIN on behalf of Plaintiff ZION WILLIAMSON (KLEIN, JEFFREY)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GINA FORD, PRIME SPORTS MARKETING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Gina Ford) (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney FITZ E. BARRINGER on behalf of Plaintiff ZION WILLIAMSON (BARRINGER, FITZ)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT E. HARRINGTON on behalf of Plaintiff ZION WILLIAMSON (HARRINGTON, ROBERT)
June 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2589491.), filed by ZION WILLIAMSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consulting and Joint Marketing and Branding Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - May 31, 2019 e-mail from Sharonda Sampson to Gina Ford, #3 Exhibit C - June 2, 2019 letter from Jeffrey Klein to Prime Sports Marketing, LLC, #4 Exhibit D - June 4, 2019 letter from JoAnn Squillace to Jeffrey Klein)(WESTER, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMSON v. PRIME SPORTS MARKETING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINA FORD
Represented By: ALVIN L. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME SPORTS MARKETING, LLC
Represented By: ALVIN L. PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZION WILLIAMSON
Represented By: JOHN R. WESTER
Represented By: ROBERT E. HARRINGTON
Represented By: FITZ E. BARRINGER
Represented By: JEFFREY S. KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?