SCOTT v. GRAPHIC PACKAGING INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Plaintiff: Danette Scott
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International LLC and GRAPHIC PACKAGING INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00595
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 9/6/2019 (Winchester, Robin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 8/21/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by GRAPHIC PACKAGING INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (TROTTER, CRYSTAL-GAYE)
June 14, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GRAPHIC PACKAGING INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (State Court document originally docketed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 19CVS5674, issued 5/14/2019, docketed as Exhibit 1 to #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against GRAPHIC PACKAGING INTERNATIONAL, LLC, filed by DANETTE SCOTT. (State Court document originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 19CVS5674, docketed as Exhibit 1 to #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant Graphic Packaging International LLC. (TROTTER, CRYSTAL-GAYE)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL From State Court against Danette Scott ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2589738.), filed by Graphic Packaging International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(TROTTER, CRYSTAL-GAYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTT v. GRAPHIC PACKAGING INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International LLC
Represented By: CRYSTAL-GAYE M. TROTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAPHIC PACKAGING INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: CRYSTAL-GAYE M. TROTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danette Scott
Represented By: NANCY PULLIAM QUINN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?