PLOGHOFT v. COLLEGE FOUNDATION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ANNA PLOGHOFT
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC and COLLEGE FOUNDATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00611
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #21 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by ANNA PLOGHOFT.(BEGNOCHE, SUZANNE)
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 9/6/2019 (Winchester, Robin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHELSEA J. COREY on behalf of Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC (COREY, CHELSEA)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THEODORE ROETHKE on behalf of Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC (ROETHKE, THEODORE)
July 12, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time and accepting #17 Answer as if timely filed. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 07/12/2019. (AULD, L.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by COLLEGE FOUNDATION, INC.. (GOTTSEGEN, ADAM)
July 9, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Williamson, Wanda)
July 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by COLLEGE FOUNDATION, INC.. (GOTTSEGEN, ADAM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 8/26/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SUZANNE R. BEGNOCHE on behalf of Plaintiff ANNA PLOGHOFT (BEGNOCHE, SUZANNE)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 ***FILED IN ERROR*** STIPULATION as to Response Time to Complaint by COLLEGE FOUNDATION, INC. (GOTTSEGEN, ADAM) Modified on 6/27/2019 to mark Filed in Error. Motion for Extension forthcoming from Attorney. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (PERLING, LEWIS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (PERLING, LEWIS)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by TRANS UNION, LLC. (DEROSSET, ROBERT)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant COLLEGE FOUNDATION, INC. (GOTTSEGEN, ADAM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ADAM M. GOTTSEGEN on behalf of Defendant COLLEGE FOUNDATION, INC. (GOTTSEGEN, ADAM)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LEWIS P. PERLING on behalf of Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC (PERLING, LEWIS)
June 19, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 19, 2019 Case assigned to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 19, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to COLLEGE FOUNDATION, INC., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC. (Original document filed in Orange County Superior Court, Case Number 19CV665 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ANNA PLOGHOFT. (Original document filed in Orange County Superior Court, Case Number 19CV665 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT COWAN DEROSSET, IV on behalf of Defendant TRANS UNION, LLC (DEROSSET, ROBERT)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANS UNION, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TRANSUNION, Corporate Parent TRANSUNION INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, INC. for TRANS UNION, LLC.. (DEROSSET, ROBERT)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL of Complaint against TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2592596.), filed by TRANS UNION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Durham County Superior Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Joinder and Consent to Removal)(DEROSSET, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLOGHOFT v. COLLEGE FOUNDATION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: LEWIS P. PERLING
Represented By: CHELSEA J. COREY
Represented By: THEODORE ROETHKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT COWAN DEROSSET, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLEGE FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: ADAM M. GOTTSEGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA PLOGHOFT
Represented By: SUZANNE R. BEGNOCHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?