MORROW v. USA
Petitioner: DEMARIO ANTOINE MORROW
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00615
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. on 7/18/2019. The court adopts the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation that Petitioner's document (Doc. #1 ) is not a proper filing, that Petitioner cannot properly bring a Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) or Privacy Act claim against the Court, and this action is DISMISSED. (Daniel, J)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 7/11/2019. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 7/15/2019. (Taylor, Abby)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 06/27/2019, that this action be dismissed.(Taylor, Abby)
June 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED for Screening (Butler, Carol)
June 17, 2019 Case Assigned to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Butler, Carol)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 FREEDOM OF INFORMATION REQUEST, filed by DEMARIO ANTOINE MORROW. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Butler, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORROW v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DEMARIO ANTOINE MORROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: ANGELA HEWLETT MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?