ROSE v. BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA et al
Plaintiff: LORELEI JOLIET ROSE
Defendant: BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA, REGINA KEENER, RUSTY BUNKER, AMANDA PARTON and JOHN ADAMICK
Case Number: 1:2019cv00621
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 Corrected document re #19 Brief. (CLODOMIR, GERARD)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 Roseboro Letter regarding Right to Respond to #18 Motion to Dismiss. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 6, 2019 Answer updated for BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA to 8/27/2019. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF re #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants John Adamcik, Rusty Bunker, Regina Keener, and Amanda Parton. (CLODOMIR, GERARD)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN ADAMICK, RUSTY BUNKER, REGINA KEENER, AMANDA PARTON. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2019 (CLODOMIR, GERARD)
August 6, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA. For good cause shown, Defendant Baptist Children's Homes of North Carolina, Inc. shall have up to and including August 27, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 8/6/2019.(Lee, Pedra)
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KENNETH PAUL CARLSON, JR on behalf of Defendants JOHN ADAMICK, BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA, RUSTY BUNKER, REGINA KEENER, AMANDA PARTON (CARLSON, KENNETH)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA. (CLODOMIR, GERARD)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GERARD M. CLODOMIR on behalf of Defendants JOHN ADAMICK, BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA, RUSTY BUNKER, REGINA KEENER, AMANDA PARTON (CLODOMIR, GERARD)
August 5, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sanders, Marlene)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CARLSON, KENNETH)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 USMS Return Executed for Complaint and Summons served on BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA on 7/16/2019. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 USMS Return Executed for Complaint and Summons served on AMANDA PARTON on 7/16/2019. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 USMS Return Executed for Complaint and Summons served on RUSTY BUNKER on 7/16/2019. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 USMS Return Executed for Complaint and Summons served on REGINA KEENER on 7/16/2019. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 USMS Return Executed for Complaint and Summons served on JOHN ADAMICK on 7/16/2019. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. Plaintiff shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to JOHN ADAMICK, BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA, RUSTY BUNKER, REGINA KEENER, AMANDA PARTON. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster on 06/24/2019, that plaintiff is permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk the correct summons for service on each defendant. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and complaint upon defendant. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 21, 2019 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 20, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JOHN ADAMICK, BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA, RUSTY BUNKER, REGINA KEENER, AMANDA PARTON, filed by LORELEI JOLIET ROSE.(Coyne, Michelle)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by LORELEI JOLIET ROSE. (Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSE v. BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOMES OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: GERARD M. CLODOMIR
Represented By: KENNETH PAUL CARLSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGINA KEENER
Represented By: GERARD M. CLODOMIR
Represented By: KENNETH PAUL CARLSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSTY BUNKER
Represented By: GERARD M. CLODOMIR
Represented By: KENNETH PAUL CARLSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA PARTON
Represented By: GERARD M. CLODOMIR
Represented By: KENNETH PAUL CARLSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ADAMICK
Represented By: GERARD M. CLODOMIR
Represented By: KENNETH PAUL CARLSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORELEI JOLIET ROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?