FLEMING v. HARTMAN, et al.

Plaintiff: Christopher Fleming
Defendant: Sheriff J.D. HARTMAN and THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00625
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Case Reassigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by J.D. HARTMAN AND THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. Answer due by 9/30/2019. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 8/16/2019 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent CINCINNATI FINANCIAL CORPORATION for THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY.. (MORGAN, JAMES)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by J.D. HARTMAN, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MORGAN, JAMES)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES R. MORGAN, JR on behalf of Defendants J.D. HARTMAN, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY (MORGAN, JAMES)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney R. MICHAEL ELLIOT on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER FLEMING (ELLIOT, R.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT M. ELLIOT on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER FLEMING (ELLIOT, ROBERT)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to J.D. HARTMAN, and THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cincinnati)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 24, 2019 Case assigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J.D. HARTMAN, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2595172.), filed by Christopher Fleming.(WINIKOFF, BENJAMIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLEMING v. HARTMAN, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Fleming
Represented By: BENJAMIN P. WINIKOFF
Represented By: ROBERT M. ELLIOT
Represented By: R. MICHAEL ELLIOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff J.D. HARTMAN
Represented By: JAMES R. MORGAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES R. MORGAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?