DOE v. CAROLINA INFORMATION INC.
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Defendant: CAROLINA INFORMATION INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00632
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Second Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint and shall file any response to #2 Motion to Proceed under Fictitious Name and for Protective Order by 09/26/2019. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/21/2019. (AULD, L.)
August 21, 2019 Motion Referred: RE: #6 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, by CAROLINA INFORMATION INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCMAHON, WILLIAM)
July 23, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint and shall file any response to #2 Motion to Proceed under Fictitious Name and for Protective Order by 08/26/2019. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 07/23/2019. (AULD, L.)
July 22, 2019 Motion Referred: RE: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Proceed under Fictitious Name , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Proceed under Fictitious Name by CAROLINA INFORMATION INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Fictitious Name and Protective Order)(MCMAHON, WILLIAM)
June 27, 2019 TEXT ORDER deferring ruling on #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed under Fictitious Name and for Protective Order, to allow the public pendency of #2 Motion to meet the procedural requirement of notice prior to court-authorized sealing of matters of record in judicial proceedings. In addition, Plaintiff shall serve a copy of #2 Motion on Defendant when making service of process, so that Defendant has a full and fair opportunity to respond to #2 Motion before the Court acts thereon. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 06/27/2019. (AULD, L.)
June 27, 2019 Motion Referred: RE: #2 MOTION to Proceed under Fictitious Name , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Cosent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CAROLINA INFORMATION INC. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 26, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed under Fictitious Name by JANE DOE. Response to Motion due by 7/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BEGNOCHE, SUZANNE)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAROLINA INFORMATION INC. d/b/a USINFOGROUP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2597785.), filed by JANE DOE.(BEGNOCHE, SUZANNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. CAROLINA INFORMATION INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: SUZANNE R. BEGNOCHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLINA INFORMATION INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM JOSEPH MCMAHON, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?