DUMARC AMERICA, INC et al v. CUCCINELLI
Plaintiff: DUMARC AMERICA, INC, CAROLYN GIBBS and JAMES GIBBS
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES and KEN CUCCINELLI
Case Number: 1:2019cv00638
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CAROLYN GIBBS, DUMARC AMERICA, INC, JAMES GIBBS filed by KEN CUCCINELLI. Replies due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration)(BAKER, STEVEN)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEVEN N. BAKER on behalf of Defendant KEN CUCCINELLI (BAKER, STEVEN)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Corrected document re #7 Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- L1A Denial)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM In Support by Plaintiffs DUMARC AMERICA, INC, CAROLYN GIBBS, JAMES GIBBS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- L1A Denial)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DUMARC AMERICA, INC, CAROLYN GIBBS, JAMES GIBBS. Response to Motion due by 8/19/2019 (BANIAS, BRADLEY)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BENJAMIN A. SNYDER on behalf of Plaintiffs DUMARC AMERICA, INC, CAROLYN GIBBS, JAMES GIBBS (SNYDER, BENJAMIN)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DUMARC AMERICA, INC, JAMES GIBBS, CAROLYN GIBBS. KEN CUCCINELLI served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. as to (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KEN CUCCINELLI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 AUSA, #2 USAG)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2598345.), filed by DUMARC AMERICA, INC, JAMES GIBBS, CAROLYN GIBBS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUMARC AMERICA, INC et al v. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN CUCCINELLI
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUMARC AMERICA, INC
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: BENJAMIN A. SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN GIBBS
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: BENJAMIN A. SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GIBBS
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: BENJAMIN A. SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?