MC MANAGEMENT, INC v. CUCCINELLI
Plaintiff: MC MANAGEMENT, INC
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES and KEN CUCCINELLI
Case Number: 1:2019cv00646
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by MC MANAGEMENT, INC. (BANIAS, BRADLEY)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEVEN N. BAKER on behalf of Defendant KEN CUCCINELLI (BAKER, STEVEN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff MC MANAGEMENT, INC re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by MC MANAGEMENT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Denial, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration, #3 Exhibit C: O*Net Code)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Briefing by MC MANAGEMENT, INC. Response to Motion due by 8/27/2019 (BANIAS, BRADLEY)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MC MANAGEMENT, INC. KEN CUCCINELLI served on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. as to (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER M. HINNANT on behalf of Plaintiff MC MANAGEMENT, INC (HINNANT, CHRISTOPHER)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent - USA. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KEN CUCCINELLI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Cucinelli, #2 AUSA)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 1, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2600182.), filed by MC MANAGEMENT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MC MANAGEMENT, INC v. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN CUCCINELLI
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MC MANAGEMENT, INC
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. HINNANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?