HAYHURST V. KELLER WILIAMS REALTY, INC.
Plaintiff: BRIAN HAYHURST
Defendant: KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00657
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC. re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC.. (ENLOE, CAREN)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC.. (ENLOE, CAREN)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney AVI R. KAUFMAN on behalf of Plaintiff BRIAN HAYHURST (KAUFMAN, AVI)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC. Answer due by 8/30/2019. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 8/5/2019 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC.. (ENLOE, CAREN)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ENLOE, CAREN)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CAREN D. ENLOE on behalf of Defendant KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC. (ENLOE, CAREN)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (JOHNSON, TED)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 2, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2601771), filed by BRIAN HAYHURST. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JOHNSON, TED)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAYHURST V. KELLER WILIAMS REALTY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC.
Represented By: CAREN D. ENLOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN HAYHURST
Represented By: TED L. JOHNSON
Represented By: AVI R. KAUFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?