STONE v. NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: KARA CHRISTINE STONE
Defendant: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00659
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Catherine C. Eagles on 07/11/2019, that the motion #4 is GRANTED, this case is closed and DISMISSED without prejudice, and the Clerk shall refund the $400.00 removal fee to Defendant Nationwide General Insurance Company through their counsel Brown Crump Vanore & Tierney, LLP. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Motions Submitted: #4 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Refund Removal Fee and Close Case)(BROWN, ROBERT)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 STANDARD ORDER. for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Williamson, Wanda)
July 3, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (BROWN, ROBERT)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2601924.), filed by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(BROWN, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STONE v. NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT SCOTT BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARA CHRISTINE STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?