LINK v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: TINA OLIVER LINK
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00662
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to Parties in Social Security Case: Plaintiff's Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2019. Defendant's Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2019. (Garland, Leah)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IN SSA CASES filed by Defendant NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Plaintiff TINA OLIVER LINK. The record is available in paper format at the Clerk's Office. (Attachments: #1 Part2 - 96-195.pdf, #2 Part3 - 196-295.pdf, #3 Part4 - 296-395.pdf, #4 Part5 - 396-495.pdf, #5 Part6 - 496-595.pdf, #6 Part7 - 596-695.pdf, #7 Part8 - 696-795.pdf, #8 Part9 - 796-895.pdf, #9 Part10 - 896-995.pdf, #10 Part11 - 996-1095.pdf, #11 Part12 - 1096-1195.pdf, #12 Part13 - 1196-1295.pdf, #13 Part14 - 1296-1395.pdf, #14 Part15 - 1396-1495.pdf, #15 Part16 - 1496-1595.pdf, #16 Part17 - 1596-1695.pdf, #17 Part18 - 1696-1795.pdf, #18 Part19 - 1796-1895.pdf, #19 Part20 - 1896-1995.pdf, #20 Part21 - 1996-2090.pdf)(FRITTS, HEATHER)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (FRITTS, HEATHER)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (BEDNARIK, MICHAEL)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent - SSA. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 US Attorney Summons, #2 US Attorney General Summons) (Sheets, Jamie)
July 3, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2602656), filed by TINA OLIVER LINK. (BEDNARIK, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINK v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA OLIVER LINK
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BEDNARIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Represented By: HEATHER T. FRITTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?