EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. 1618 CONCEPTS, INC., et al
Plaintiff: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Defendant: NORTHERN LIGHTS INC., 1618 CONCEPTS, INC. and 1618 DOWNTOWN, INC.
Intervenor: PETER LOUIS MATUSIK
Case Number: 1:2019cv00672
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by PETER LOUIS MATUSIK filed by 1618 CONCEPTS, INC., 1618 DOWNTOWN, INC., NORTHERN LIGHTS INC.. Replies due by 9/20/2019 (DEBOARD, CAMILLA)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by 1618 CONCEPTS, INC., 1618 DOWNTOWN, INC., NORTHERN LIGHTS INC.. (DEBOARD, CAMILLA)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants 1618 CONCEPTS, INC., 1618 DOWNTOWN, INC., NORTHERN LIGHTS INC. re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to 12(b)(1) and Failure to State a Claim filed by 1618 CONCEPTS, INC., 1618 DOWNTOWN, INC., NORTHERN LIGHTS INC.. (DEBOARD, CAMILLA)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to 12(b)(1) and Failure to State a Claim by 1618 CONCEPTS, INC., 1618 DOWNTOWN, INC., NORTHERN LIGHTS INC.. Response to Motion due by 9/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss for Subject Matter: Notice of Charge)(DEBOARD, CAMILLA)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SPENSER T. SMITH on behalf of Defendants 1618 CONCEPTS, INC., 1618 DOWNTOWN, INC., NORTHERN LIGHTS INC. (SMITH, SPENSER)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 Intervenor BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Intervene . (MCDONALD, DAVID)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by Peter Louis Matusik. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Intervenor Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Intervenor Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, Photo)(MCDONALD, DAVID)
July 30, 2019 Reset Deadline: 1618 DOWNTOWN, INC. answer due 9/9/2019. (Garland, Leah)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. NORTHERN LIGHTS INC. waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Signed Waiver of Service of Summons)(BROCK, YOLANDA)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. 1618 DOWNTOWN, INC. waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Signed Waiver of Service)(BROCK, YOLANDA) Modified on 7/30/2019 to correct docket text and update answer deadline. (Garland, Leah)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. 1618 CONCEPTS, INC. waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Signed Waiver of Service- 1618 Concepts, Inc)(BROCK, YOLANDA)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KENNETH B. ROTENSTREICH on behalf of Defendants 1618 CONCEPTS, INC., 1618 DOWNTOWN, INC., NORTHERN LIGHTS INC. (ROTENSTREICH, KENNETH)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CAMILLA F. DEBOARD on behalf of Defendants 1618 CONCEPTS, INC., 1618 DOWNTOWN, INC., NORTHERN LIGHTS INC. (DEBOARD, CAMILLA)
July 10, 2019 Case assigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nicholas J. Wilson on 7/9/2019 by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. Waiver of Service due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(BROCK, YOLANDA)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nicholas Wyatt on 7/9/2019 by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. Waiver of Service due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(BROCK, YOLANDA)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nicholas J. Wilson on 7/9/2019 by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. Waiver of Service due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(BROCK, YOLANDA)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION.(BROCK, YOLANDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. 1618 CONCEPTS, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN LIGHTS INC.
Represented By: CAMILLA F. DEBOARD
Represented By: KENNETH B. ROTENSTREICH
Represented By: SPENSER T. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1618 CONCEPTS, INC.
Represented By: CAMILLA F. DEBOARD
Represented By: KENNETH B. ROTENSTREICH
Represented By: SPENSER T. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1618 DOWNTOWN, INC.
Represented By: CAMILLA F. DEBOARD
Represented By: KENNETH B. ROTENSTREICH
Represented By: SPENSER T. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Represented By: YOLANDA WARREN BROCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: PETER LOUIS MATUSIK
Represented By: DAVID W. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?