BURTON v. SAUL
Plaintiff: MICHELLE BURTON
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00698
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to Parties in Social Security Case: Plaintiff's Dispositive Motions due by 11/5/2019. Defendant's Dispositive Motions due by 1/4/2020. (Garland, Leah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IN SSA CASES filed by Plaintiff MICHELLE BURTON, Defendant ANDREW SAUL. The record is available in paper format at the Clerk's Office. (Attachments: #1 Part2 - 97-196.pdf, #2 Part3 - 197-296.pdf, #3 Part4 - 297-396.pdf, #4 Part5 - 397-496.pdf, #5 Part6 - 497-598.pdf)(DRUM, ROBERT) Modified on 9/9/2019, received in clerk's office on 09/06/2019. (Taylor, Abby).
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ANDREW SAUL. (DRUM, ROBERT)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to ANDREW SAUL served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. as to (HALL, CHARLOTTE)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent - SSA. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld on 07/19/2019, that Plaintiff is permitted to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days form the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the complaint and summons upon each defendant. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 16, 2019 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld RE: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by MICHELLE BURTON. (HALL, CHARLOTTE)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by MICHELLE BURTON.(HALL, CHARLOTTE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURTON v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Represented By: ROBERT S. DRUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE BURTON
Represented By: CHARLOTTE W. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?