COLLINS v. SAUL
Plaintiff: LIZ D. COLLINS
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL and ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00712
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT on Affidavit of Service as to ANDREW SAUL served on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. on Affidavit of Service as to (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts of Summons)(WILSON, JASON)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Barr, #2 Martin)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent - SSA. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster on 07/23/2019, that plaintiff is permitted to commence said proceeding in this court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the complaint and summons upon the defendant. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 19, 2019 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster RE: #2 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 19, 2019 Case assigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP () by LIZ D COLLINS. (WILSON, JASON)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by LIZ D COLLINS.(WILSON, JASON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLLINS v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIZ D. COLLINS
Represented By: JASON LEE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?