PALACIOS v. TYSON FOODS, INC.
Plaintiff: GLORIA A. PALACIOS
Defendant: TYSON FOODS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00741
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 Corrected document re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of David Sutton)(DALTON, KEVIN)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court North Carolina filed by GLORIA A. PALACIOS filed by TYSON FOODS, INC.. Replies due by 9/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Dvid Sutton)(DALTON, KEVIN)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court North Carolina by GLORIA A. PALACIOS. Response to Motion due by 9/23/2019 (JENKINS, LAURA)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 10/23/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by TYSON FOODS, INC.. (DALTON, KEVIN)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for TYSON FOODS, INC. Answer due by 8/21/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 07/31/2019. (Brubaker, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by TYSON FOODS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DALTON, KEVIN)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. (Garland, Leah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to TYSON FOODS, INC. (State Court document filed in Lee County Superior Court, case number 19CV535, issued 6/17/2019, docketed as Exhibit 1 to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against TYSON FOODS, INC., filed by GLORIA A. PALACIOS. (State Court Document originally filed in Lee County Superior Court, case number 19CV535, docketed as Exhibit 1 to the #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney LAURA S. JENKINS. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 8/23/2019. (Garland, Leah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DEVEN S. GRAY on behalf of Defendant TYSON FOODS, INC. (GRAY, DEVEN)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TYSON FOODS, INC.. (DALTON, KEVIN)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Gloria A Palacios, filed by TYSON FOODS, INC. (Filing fee of $400.00 paid. Receipt number: 0418-2616320) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DALTON, KEVIN) Modified on 7/24/2019 to add filing fee payment information. (Garland, Leah)
July 24, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
July 24, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PALACIOS v. TYSON FOODS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA A. PALACIOS
Represented By: LAURA S. JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYSON FOODS, INC.
Represented By: DEVEN S. GRAY
Represented By: KEVIN J. DALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?