HINES v. BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NC
Plaintiff: ANTOINETTE HINES
Defendant: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00754
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NC. Answer due by 9/23/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/21/2019. (Brubaker, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ISAAC AUGUSTIN LINNARTZ on behalf of Defendant BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NC (LINNARTZ, ISAAC)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SHAD, KERRY)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NC. (SHAD, KERRY)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KERRY A. SHAD on behalf of Defendant BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NC (SHAD, KERRY)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NC. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 25, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Antoinette Hines. (SCHILLER, DAVID)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2617427.), filed by Antoinette Hines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination (EEOC), #2 Exhibit Right to Sue (EEOC), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHILLER, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HINES v. BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTOINETTE HINES
Represented By: DAVID GARRETT SCHILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NC
Represented By: KERRY A. SHAD
Represented By: ISAAC AUGUSTIN LINNARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?