BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. et al v. SAXTON ENTERTAINMENT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., ELEKSYLUM MUSIC, INC., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., POST OAK PUBLISHING, NO SURRENDER MUSIC, ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, CYANIDE PUBLISHING, WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP. and UNIVERSAL-SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Defendant: AMANDA STANLEY, SAXTON ENTERTAINMENT, LLC and BRYAN M. WHEELOCK
Case Number: 1:2019cv00758
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SAXTON ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, AMANDA STANLEY, BRYAN M. WHEELOCK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FREEMAN, ANDREW)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Saxton Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Wheelock Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Stanley Proof of Service)(KAPP, MICHAEL)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for All Defendants. Answer due by 9/21/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/22/2019. (Brubaker, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SAXTON ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, AMANDA STANLEY, BRYAN M. WHEELOCK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FREEMAN, ANDREW) Modified on 8/21/2019 to correct event type. (Taylor, Abby).
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Wheelock Clemmons, #2 Stanley, #3 Stanley Clemmons, #4 Stanley Bar, #5 Saxton VSTap, #6 Saxton, #7 Saxton 3, #8 Saxton 4)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NO SURRENDER MUSIC. (KAPP, MICHAEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELEKSYLUM MUSIC, INC. identifying Corporate Parent ELEKTRA/ASYLUM/NONESUCH RECORDS, A DIVISION OF WARNER COMMUNICATIONS for ELEKSYLUM MUSIC, INC... (KAPP, MICHAEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP. identifying Corporate Parent WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP. for WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP... (KAPP, MICHAEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC. (KAPP, MICHAEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC. identifying Corporate Parent VIVENDI SA for SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC... (KAPP, MICHAEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by POST OAK PUBLISHING. (KAPP, MICHAEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SONY/ATV SONGS LLC identifying Corporate Parent SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, INC. for SONY/ATV SONGS LLC.. (KAPP, MICHAEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CYANIDE PUBLISHING. (KAPP, MICHAEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent EMI GROUP GLOBAL LTD. for EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC... (KAPP, MICHAEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNIVERSAL-SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying Corporate Parent VIVENDI SA for UNIVERSAL-SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC... (KAPP, MICHAEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, INC. for BROADCAST MUSIC, INC... (KAPP, MICHAEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL KEITH KAPP on behalf of Plaintiffs BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., CYANIDE PUBLISHING, ELEKSYLUM MUSIC, INC., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, NO SURRENDER MUSIC, POST OAK PUBLISHING, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, UNIVERSAL-SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP. (KAPP, MICHAEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2618036.), filed by SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., UNIVERSAL-SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC., ELEKSYLUM MUSIC, INC., POST OAK PUBLISHING, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, NO SURRENDER MUSIC, CYANIDE PUBLISHING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAPP, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. et al v. SAXTON ENTERTAINMENT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL KEITH KAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL KEITH KAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELEKSYLUM MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL KEITH KAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONY/ATV SONGS LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL KEITH KAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL KEITH KAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POST OAK PUBLISHING
Represented By: MICHAEL KEITH KAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NO SURRENDER MUSIC
Represented By: MICHAEL KEITH KAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL KEITH KAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYANIDE PUBLISHING
Represented By: MICHAEL KEITH KAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP.
Represented By: MICHAEL KEITH KAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL-SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL KEITH KAPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA STANLEY
Represented By: ANDREW ALLEN FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAXTON ENTERTAINMENT, LLC
Represented By: ANDREW ALLEN FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN M. WHEELOCK
Represented By: ANDREW ALLEN FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?