HARVEY v. MORRIS,et al
Plaintiff: CASSANDRA HARVEY
Defendant: MORRIS OLDYN, UTICA COLLISION, STATE FARM AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY and OLDYN S. MORRIS
Case Number: 1:2019cv00760
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to OLDYN S. MORRIS, and STATE FARM AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 9, 2019 Motion Referred: RE: #7 MOTION for Leave to Amend #2 Complaint, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Blay, Debbie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE entitled "Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant for Production of Documents to Defendant" by CASSANDRA HARVEY. (Butler, Carol)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support of Plaintiff Complaint re #2 Complaint by Plaintiff CASSANDRA HARVEY filed by CASSANDRA HARVEY. (Butler, Carol)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Amend the Complaint re #2 Complaint by CASSANDRA HARVEY. Response to Motion due by 9/30/2019. (Butler, Carol)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake on 09/05/2019, that Plaintiff is permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and complaint upon defendant. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant OLDYN S. MORRIS, STATE FARM AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY, UTICA COLLISION, filed by CASSANDRA HARVEY.(Coyne, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Motions Referred to Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Signed Pro Se Electronic Service Consent by CASSANDRA HARVEY Bstterhope01@aol.com (Coyne, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against MORRIS OLDYN, STATE FARM AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by CASSANDRA HARVEY.(Coyne, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP () by CASSANDRA HARVEY. (Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARVEY v. MORRIS,et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASSANDRA HARVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRIS OLDYN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTICA COLLISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLDYN S. MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?