WILSON v. FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lauralee Wilson and LAURALEE WILSON, M.D.
Defendant: Novant Health, Inc. and Forsyth Medical Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00801
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Appointing M. ANN ANDERSON, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Kemp, Donita)
August 13, 2020 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 4/30/2021. (Kemp, Donita)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 8/12/2020; that the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report [Doc. #22 ] is approved as submitted and as noted herein. Discovery shall be placed on a case management track designated in LR 26.1(a) as Complex. Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Mediation should be conducted during the discovery period, the exact date to be set by the mediator after consultation with the parties. The parties agree that the mediator shall be Ann Anderson. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2020. Defendants' Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2020. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 8/31/2020. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 9/30/2020. The parties do not consent to magistrate jurisdiction and agree that no other special procedures are necessary or appropriate at this time. Trial of this action is expected to take approximately three (3) to five (5) days. A jury trial has been demanded. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 11, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #22 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
August 7, 2020 Filing 22 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC.(GIFT, ELIZABETH)
August 6, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MARGARET S. HANRAHAN on behalf of Defendants FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC, NOVANT HEALTH, INC. (HANRAHAN, MARGARET)
June 30, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 8/20/2020 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 6/29/2020; that Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. #9 ), is GRANTED. (Sheets, Jamie)
January 10, 2020 Motions Submitted: #9 MOTION to Dismiss to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. (Sanders, Marlene)
November 27, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC, NOVANT HEALTH, INC. to #9 MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (GIFT, ELIZABETH) Modified on 11/27/2019 to correct title and delete incorrectly set deadline. (Sheets, Jamie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC filed by LAURALEE WILSON, MD. Replies due by 11/27/2019 (WINIKOFF, BENJAMIN)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 10/31/2019; that Plaintiff's motion for extension, (Doc. #14 ), is GRANTED and that the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' partial motion to dismiss is extended to November 13, 2019. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 Defendants' Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC, NOVANT HEALTH, INC.. (GIFT, ELIZABETH)
October 29, 2019 Motion Submitted re: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss, to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. (Welch, Kelly)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss by LAURALEE WILSON, MD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ELLIOT, ROBERT)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant NOVANT HEALTH, INC. (GIFT, ELIZABETH)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC (GIFT, ELIZABETH)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC, NOVANT HEALTH, INC. (GIFT, ELIZABETH) Modified on 10/10/2019 to add additional filing party. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC, NOVANT HEALTH, INC. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC, NOVANT HEALTH, INC. (GIFT, ELIZABETH) Modified on 10/10/2019 to add additional filing party. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC, NOVANT HEALTH, INC. Response to Motion due by 10/30/2019. (GIFT, ELIZABETH) Modified on 10/10/2019 to add additional filing party. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to All Defendants. (WINIKOFF, BENJAMIN)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC and NOVANT HEALTH, INC. Answer due by 10/9/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/28/2019. (Brubaker, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ELIZABETH R. GIFT on behalf of Defendants FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC, NOVANT HEALTH, INC. (GIFT, ELIZABETH)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC, NOVANT HEALTH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GIFT, ELIZABETH)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BENJAMIN P. WINIKOFF on behalf of Plaintiff LAURALEE WILSON, MD (WINIKOFF, BENJAMIN)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC, NOVANT HEALTH, INC. (Attachments: #1 Novant)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 7, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT M. ELLIOT on behalf of Plaintiff LAURALEE WILSON, MD. (ELLIOT, ROBERT) Modified on 8/7/2019 and replaced Document #2 with correct image. (Daniel, J)
August 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2625390.), filed by LAURALEE WILSON.(ELLIOT, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. FORSYTH MEDICAL GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauralee Wilson
Represented By: ROBERT M. ELLIOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURALEE WILSON, M.D.
Represented By: ROBERT M. ELLIOT
Represented By: BENJAMIN P. WINIKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novant Health, Inc.
Represented By: ELIZABETH R. GIFT
Represented By: MARGARET S. HANRAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forsyth Medical Group, LLC
Represented By: ELIZABETH R. GIFT
Represented By: MARGARET S. HANRAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?