GRIFFIN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: JOHNNIE RAY GRIFFIN, JR.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00805
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT on certified mail as to All Defendants. on certified mail as to U.S. Attorney's Office, Middle District of North Carolina (HART, KRISTIN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT on certified mail as to All Defendants. on certified mail as to Attorney General (HART, KRISTIN)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (US Attorney General). (Coyne, Michelle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USAG, #2 AUSA)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 7, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2625889.), filed by johnnie ray griffin, jr.(HART, KRISTIN) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/7/2019) (Coyne, Michelle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIFFIN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNIE RAY GRIFFIN, JR.
Represented By: KRISTIN L. HART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?