CANNON, et al V. SELECT MANAGMENT RESOURCES, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: ERIC FIELDS, ALEXIS CANNON, ANTONE WHIDBEE, Latiana Walker, Raven White-Brevard, Brittany Williams, SHONTA BLACKBURN DAVIS, LETITIA BENNETT, ROBERT BARRINGER, MARK COPE, Lorrie Johnson, ANESTIA NEWKIRK, Douglas McKoy, Darlene Lewis, Jessica Radtke, Edna Taylor, Tanisha Tarpley, Kellie Kemp, JOSEPH DANIEL, Karen Holland, Eula Wheeler, ALTHEA BROOKS, MICHAEL FAISON, Jennifer Thacker, DENNIS BROADY, Suzanne Miller, Robert Gonzales, Deangelo Mason, HEATHER BANKS, Claudette Shears, Marion D. Williamson, Henry Shipp, SHALEIA ANDREA BRASWELL, BRANDY COPE, Mary Walker, Reginald Vines, SHERAMIKA BULLUCK, ASHLEY RORIE, Rhonda Reavis, Krista Thomas, DARION BREEDEN, Ernandez Robinson, CHELSEA BREVARD, Erica Leath, Tanita Jones, Lamisha Williams, JASON FLOYD, TILEN ELLERBEE, David Whitsett, CHARLES APPLEWHITE, Najah Williams, Willie Gilliam, Jr., BEATRICE TURRENTINE, JEFFREY COFFEY, Charles Spinks, Phillip Steele, AMEI DAVIS, Kierra Miller and BRENDA CARTER
Defendant: North American Title Loans, LLC, ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC, Kipling Financial Services, LLC, LoanMax, LLC, LOANMAX,LLC and SELECT MANAGMENT RESOURCES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00823
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Motions Submitted: #22 MOTION to Compel Arbitrations to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
October 4, 2019 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT by CHARLES APPLEWHITE, HEATHER BANKS, ROBERT BARRINGER, LETITIA BENNETT, SHALEIA ANDREA BRASWELL, DARION BREEDEN, CHELSEA BREVARD, DENNIS BROADY, ALTHEA BROOKS, SHERAMIKA BULLUCK, ALEXIS CANNON, BRENDA CARTER, JEFFREY COFFEY, BRANDY COPE, MARK COPE, JOSEPH DANIEL, AMEI DAVIS, SHONTA BLACKBURN DAVIS, TILEN ELLERBEE, MICHAEL FAISON, ERIC FIELDS, JASON FLOYD, WILLIE GILLIAM, JR, ROBERT GONZALES, KAREN HOLLAND, LORRIE JOHNSON, TANITA JONES, KELLIE KEMP, ERICA LEATH, DARLENE LEWIS, DEANGELO MASON, DOUGLAS MCKOY, KIERRA MILLER, SUZANNE MILLER, ANESTIA NEWKIRK, JESSICA RADTKE, RHONDA REAVIS, ERNANDEZ ROBINSON, ASHLEY RORIE, CLAUDETTE SHEARS, HENRY SHIPP, CHARLES SPINKS, PHILLIP STEELE, TANISHA TARPLEY, EDNA TAYLOR, JENNIFER THACKER, KRISTA THOMAS, BEATRICE TURRENTINE, REGINALD VINES, LATIANA WALKER, MARY WALKER, EULA WHEELER, ANTONE WHIDBEE, RAVEN WHITE-BREVARD, DAVID WHITSETT, BRITTANY WILLIAMS, LAMISHA WILLIAMS, NAJAH WILLIAMS, MARION D. WILLIAMSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart of Unsettled Cases)(FAUCHER, JAMES)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Defendants ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, KIPLING FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, LOANMAX,LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, SELECT MANAGMENT RESOURCES, LLC re #22 MOTION to Compel Arbitrations filed by MARY WALKER, CHARLES APPLEWHITE, DARION BREEDEN, ROBERT GONZALES, LETITIA BENNETT, MARION D. WILLIAMSON, BRITTANY WILLIAMS, EDNA TAYLOR, DEANGELO MASON, ALEXIS CANNON, ALTHEA BROOKS, DOUGLAS MCKOY filed by ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, KIPLING FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, LOANMAX,LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, SELECT MANAGMENT RESOURCES, LLC. Replies due by 10/17/2019 (LAWSON, CATHERINE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 BRIEF re #22 MOTION to Compel Arbitrations . (FAUCHER, JAMES)
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Compel Arbitrations by CHARLES APPLEWHITE, LETITIA BENNETT, DARION BREEDEN, ALTHEA BROOKS, ALEXIS CANNON, ROBERT GONZALES, DEANGELO MASON, DOUGLAS MCKOY, EDNA TAYLOR, MARY WALKER, BRITTANY WILLIAMS, MARION D. WILLIAMSON. Response to Motion due by 10/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Movant List)(FAUCHER, JAMES)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 9/23/2019; that the Joint Report [Doc. #20 ] is adopted, and the Parties must file a Supplemental Rule 26() Report, with specific dates included, within 14 days if the Motion to Compel Arbitration is denied in whole or in part. FURTHER that Plaintiffs will file their Motion to Compel Arbitration by Thursday, September 26, 2019, and Defendants will file their response by Thursday October 3, 2019. FURTHER that the Parties will file a status report by Thursday, October 3, 2019, setting out the status of the case, and for any Plaintiff in this case who has not reached a settlement agreement, specifying the name of the Plaintiff, the specific Defendant(s), and the arbitration agreement at issue. Discovery shall be placed on a case-management track designated in LR 26.1(a) as Complex. Mediation should be conducted late in the discovery period, the exact date to be set by the mediator after consultation with the parties. The parties agree that the mediator shall be Jonathan Harkavy. The parties do not consent to this case to the reference of this case to a Magistrate Judge. Trial of the action is expected to take approximately 4 to 8 weeks. A jury trial has not been demanded. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE: Telephone Conference/Initial Pretrial Conference held on September 19, 2019, attended by Attorney James Faucher for plaintiffs, Attorney Catherine Lawson for defendants. Motions to Compel Arbitration due by 9/26/2019; Responses due by 10/3/2019; Status Report due by 10/3/2019; The Court adopts the Joint Rule 26(f) Reports as filed in all cases on 9/16/2019; Written Order forthcoming. (Proceedings Recorded) (Kemp, Donita)
September 17, 2019 Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset as a Telephone Conference for 9/19/2019 02:30 PM before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Parties emailed instructions for initiating call. (Garrett, Kim)
September 16, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #20 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT Joint 26(f) by Plaintiffs CHARLES APPLEWHITE, HEATHER BANKS, ROBERT BARRINGER, LETITIA BENNETT, SHALEIA ANDREA BRASWELL, DARION BREEDEN, CHELSEA BREVARD, DENNIS BROADY, ALTHEA BROOKS, SHERAMIKA BULLUCK, ALEXIS CANNON, BRENDA CARTER, JEFFREY COFFEY, BRANDY COPE, MARK COPE, JOSEPH DANIEL, AMEI DAVIS, SHONTA BLACKBURN DAVIS, TILEN ELLERBEE, MICHAEL FAISON, ERIC FIELDS, JASON FLOYD, WILLIE GILLIAM, JR, ROBERT GONZALES, KAREN HOLLAND, LORRIE JOHNSON, TANITA JONES, KELLIE KEMP, ERICA LEATH, DARLENE LEWIS, DEANGELO MASON, DOUGLAS MCKOY, KIERRA MILLER, SUZANNE MILLER, ANESTIA NEWKIRK, JESSICA RADTKE, RHONDA REAVIS, ERNANDEZ ROBINSON, ASHLEY RORIE, CLAUDETTE SHEARS, HENRY SHIPP, CHARLES SPINKS, PHILLIP STEELE, TANISHA TARPLEY, EDNA TAYLOR, JENNIFER THACKER, KRISTA THOMAS, BEATRICE TURRENTINE, REGINALD VINES, LATIANA WALKER, MARY WALKER, EULA WHEELER, ANTONE WHIDBEE, RAVEN WHITE-BREVARD, DAVID WHITSETT, BRITTANY WILLIAMS, LAMISHA WILLIAMS, NAJAH WILLIAMS, MARION D. WILLIAMSON, Counter Defendants CHARLES APPLEWHITE, HEATHER BANKS, ROBERT BARRINGER, LETITIA BENNETT, SHALEIA ANDREA BRASWELL, DARION BREEDEN, CHELSEA BREVARD, DENNIS BROADY, ALTHEA BROOKS, SHERAMIKA BULLUCK, ALEXIS CANNON, BRENDA CARTER, JEFFREY COFFEY, BRANDY COPE, MARK COPE, JOSEPH DANIEL, AMEI DAVIS, SHONTA BLACKBURN DAVIS, TILEN ELLERBEE, MICHAEL FAISON, ERIC FIELDS, JASON FLOYD, WILLIE GILLIAM, JR, ROBERT GONZALES, KAREN HOLLAND, LORRIE JOHNSON, TANITA JONES, KELLIE KEMP, ERICA LEATH, DARLENE LEWIS, DEANGELO MASON, DOUGLAS MCKOY, KIERRA MILLER, SUZANNE MILLER, ANESTIA NEWKIRK, JESSICA RADTKE, RHONDA REAVIS, ERNANDEZ ROBINSON, ASHLEY RORIE, CLAUDETTE SHEARS, HENRY SHIPP, CHARLES SPINKS, PHILLIP STEELE, TANISHA TARPLEY, EDNA TAYLOR, JENNIFER THACKER, KRISTA THOMAS, BEATRICE TURRENTINE, REGINALD VINES, LATIANA WALKER, MARY WALKER, EULA WHEELER, ANTONE WHIDBEE, RAVEN WHITE-BREVARD, DAVID WHITSETT, BRITTANY WILLIAMS, LAMISHA WILLIAMS, NAJAH WILLIAMS, MARION D. WILLIAMSON. (FAUCHER, JAMES) Modified on 9/16/2019 to correct event used (Garrett, Kim).
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT by CHARLES APPLEWHITE, HEATHER BANKS, ROBERT BARRINGER, LETITIA BENNETT, SHALEIA ANDREA BRASWELL, DARION BREEDEN, CHELSEA BREVARD, DENNIS BROADY, ALTHEA BROOKS, SHERAMIKA BULLUCK, ALEXIS CANNON, BRENDA CARTER, JEFFREY COFFEY, BRANDY COPE, MARK COPE, JOSEPH DANIEL, AMEI DAVIS, SHONTA BLACKBURN DAVIS, TILEN ELLERBEE, MICHAEL FAISON, ERIC FIELDS, JASON FLOYD, WILLIE GILLIAM, JR, ROBERT GONZALES, KAREN HOLLAND, LORRIE JOHNSON, TANITA JONES, KELLIE KEMP, ERICA LEATH, DARLENE LEWIS, DEANGELO MASON, DOUGLAS MCKOY, KIERRA MILLER, SUZANNE MILLER, ANESTIA NEWKIRK, JESSICA RADTKE, RHONDA REAVIS, ERNANDEZ ROBINSON, ASHLEY RORIE, CLAUDETTE SHEARS, HENRY SHIPP, CHARLES SPINKS, PHILLIP STEELE, TANISHA TARPLEY, EDNA TAYLOR, JENNIFER THACKER, KRISTA THOMAS, BEATRICE TURRENTINE, REGINALD VINES, LATIANA WALKER, MARY WALKER, EULA WHEELER, ANTONE WHIDBEE, RAVEN WHITE-BREVARD, DAVID WHITSETT, BRITTANY WILLIAMS, LAMISHA WILLIAMS, NAJAH WILLIAMS, MARION D. WILLIAMSON. (FAUCHER, JAMES)
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 9/19/2019 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JEFFREY K. PERALDO on behalf of Plaintiffs CHARLES APPLEWHITE, HEATHER BANKS, ROBERT BARRINGER, LETITIA BENNETT, SHALEIA ANDREA BRASWELL, DARION BREEDEN, CHELSEA BREVARD, DENNIS BROADY, ALTHEA BROOKS, SHERAMIKA BULLUCK, ALEXIS CANNON, BRENDA CARTER, JEFFREY COFFEY, BRANDY COPE, MARK COPE, JOSEPH DANIEL, AMEI DAVIS, SHONTA BLACKBURN DAVIS, TILEN ELLERBEE, MICHAEL FAISON, ERIC FIELDS, JASON FLOYD, WILLIE GILLIAM, JR, ROBERT GONZALES, KAREN HOLLAND, LORRIE JOHNSON, TANITA JONES, KELLIE KEMP, ERICA LEATH, DARLENE LEWIS, DEANGELO MASON, DOUGLAS MCKOY, KIERRA MILLER, SUZANNE MILLER, ANESTIA NEWKIRK, JESSICA RADTKE, RHONDA REAVIS, ERNANDEZ ROBINSON, ASHLEY RORIE, CLAUDETTE SHEARS, HENRY SHIPP, CHARLES SPINKS, PHILLIP STEELE, TANISHA TARPLEY, EDNA TAYLOR, JENNIFER THACKER, KRISTA THOMAS, BEATRICE TURRENTINE, REGINALD VINES, LATIANA WALKER, MARY WALKER, EULA WHEELER, ANTONE WHIDBEE, RAVEN WHITE-BREVARD, DAVID WHITSETT, BRITTANY WILLIAMS, LAMISHA WILLIAMS, NAJAH WILLIAMS, MARION D. WILLIAMSON (PERALDO, JEFFREY)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 Reply ANSWER to Complaint Counterclaim by CHARLES APPLEWHITE, HEATHER BANKS, ROBERT BARRINGER, LETITIA BENNETT, SHALEIA ANDREA BRASWELL, DARION BREEDEN, CHELSEA BREVARD, DENNIS BROADY, ALTHEA BROOKS, SHERAMIKA BULLUCK, ALEXIS CANNON, BRENDA CARTER, JEFFREY COFFEY, BRANDY COPE, MARK COPE, JOSEPH DANIEL, AMEI DAVIS, SHONTA BLACKBURN DAVIS, TILEN ELLERBEE, MICHAEL FAISON, ERIC FIELDS, JASON FLOYD, WILLIE GILLIAM, JR, ROBERT GONZALES, KAREN HOLLAND, LORRIE JOHNSON, TANITA JONES, KELLIE KEMP, ERICA LEATH, DARLENE LEWIS, DEANGELO MASON, DOUGLAS MCKOY, KIERRA MILLER, SUZANNE MILLER, ANESTIA NEWKIRK, JESSICA RADTKE, RHONDA REAVIS, ERNANDEZ ROBINSON, ASHLEY RORIE, CLAUDETTE SHEARS, HENRY SHIPP, CHARLES SPINKS, PHILLIP STEELE, TANISHA TARPLEY, EDNA TAYLOR, JENNIFER THACKER, KRISTA THOMAS, BEATRICE TURRENTINE, REGINALD VINES, LATIANA WALKER, MARY WALKER, EULA WHEELER, ANTONE WHIDBEE, RAVEN WHITE-BREVARD, DAVID WHITSETT, BRITTANY WILLIAMS, LAMISHA WILLIAMS, NAJAH WILLIAMS, MARION D. WILLIAMSON. (FAUCHER, JAMES)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #11 Complaint, Counterclaim against by LOANSMART, LLC, ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, KIPLING FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, SELECT MANAGMENT RESOURCES, LLC, LOANMAX,LLC. (LAWSON, CATHERINE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
August 13, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Original documents issued in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS6976, on 07/08/2019 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by KAREN HOLLAND, JOSEPH DANIEL, EDNA TAYLOR, BEATRICE TURRENTINE, HEATHER BANKS, DEANGELO MASON, DARLENE LEWIS, MICHAEL FAISON, SUZANNE MILLER, HENRY SHIPP, TANITA JONES, DOUGLAS MCKOY, BRITTANY WILLIAMS, JESSICA RADTKE, KIERRA MILLER, CHARLES APPLEWHITE, REGINALD VINES, JEFFREY COFFEY, ROBERT BARRINGER, LETITIA BENNETT, MARION D. WILLIAMSON, CHARLES SPINKS, TILEN ELLERBEE, DARION BREEDEN, SHALEIA ANDREA BRASWELL, TANISHA TARPLEY, NAJAH WILLIAMS, DENNIS BROADY, SHONTA BLACKBURN DAVIS, ALTHEA BROOKS, DAVID WHITSETT, ALEXIS CANNON, JENNIFER THACKER, EULA WHEELER, JASON FLOYD, LORRIE JOHNSON, CLAUDETTE SHEARS, WILLIE GILLIAM, JR, RHONDA REAVIS, ERNANDEZ ROBINSON, SHERAMIKA BULLUCK, ERIC FIELDS, MARK COPE, PHILLIP STEELE, ERICA LEATH, CHELSEA BREVARD, ASHLEY RORIE, AMEI DAVIS, KRISTA THOMAS, ROBERT GONZALES, BRENDA CARTER, RAVEN WHITE-BREVARD, BRANDY COPE, LATIANA WALKER, ANESTIA NEWKIRK, KELLIE KEMP, LAMISHA WILLIAMS, MARY WALKER, ANTONE WHIDBEE.(Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS6976 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON on behalf of Defendants ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, Kipling Financial Services, LLC, LoanMax, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC (LAWSON, CATHERINE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD on behalf of Defendants ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, Kipling Financial Services, LLC, LoanMax, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC (ARROWOOD, CATHARINE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MELANIE BLACK DUBIS on behalf of Defendants Anderson Financial Services, LLC, Kipling Financial Services, LLC, LoanMax, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Management Resources, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Title Loans, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LoanSmart, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LoanMax, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kipling Financial Services, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anderson Financial Services, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2629367.)(Related Case # 1:19-cv-670, 1:19-cv-321, 1:19-cv-325, 1:19-cv-575,), filed by LoanSmart, LLC, Anderson Financial Services, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Kipling Financial Services, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC, LoanMax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Kenneth R. Wayco)(DUBIS, MELANIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANNON, et al V. SELECT MANAGMENT RESOURCES, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC FIELDS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIS CANNON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONE WHIDBEE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latiana Walker
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raven White-Brevard
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Williams
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHONTA BLACKBURN DAVIS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LETITIA BENNETT
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BARRINGER
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK COPE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrie Johnson
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANESTIA NEWKIRK
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas McKoy
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Lewis
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Radtke
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Taylor
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanisha Tarpley
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Kemp
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DANIEL
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Holland
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eula Wheeler
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTHEA BROOKS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FAISON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Thacker
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS BROADY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Miller
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gonzales
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deangelo Mason
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER BANKS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudette Shears
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion D. Williamson
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Shipp
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHALEIA ANDREA BRASWELL
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDY COPE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Walker
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Vines
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERAMIKA BULLUCK
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY RORIE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Reavis
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Thomas
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARION BREEDEN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernandez Robinson
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHELSEA BREVARD
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Leath
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanita Jones
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamisha Williams
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON FLOYD
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TILEN ELLERBEE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Whitsett
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES APPLEWHITE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Najah Williams
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Gilliam, Jr.
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEATRICE TURRENTINE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY COFFEY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Spinks
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Steele
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMEI DAVIS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kierra Miller
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA CARTER
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Loans, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanSmart, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Management Resources, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kipling Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanMax, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOANMAX,LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT MANAGMENT RESOURCES, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?