HARGRAVE v. DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: BRIAN HARGRAVE
Defendant: DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00838
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent DAIMLER AG, Corporate Parent Daimler Trucks & Buses US Holding Inc. for DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA.. (DOUGLAS, SARAH)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/25/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, Corporate Parent DAIMLER AG for DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA.. (DOUGLAS, SARAH) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/4/2019 with permanent pdf image.) (Taylor, Abby).
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA. (DOUGLAS, SARAH)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 USMS Return Executed -Complaint/Summons/Notice served on ERICK JOHNSON, PLANT MANAGER of DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA on 09/17/2019, Answer due 10/08/2019. (Taylor, Abby)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld on 08/19/2019, that Plaintiff Brian Hargrave is permitted to commence said proceeding in this court, without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days form the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and complaint upon defendant. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 16, 2019 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 16, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, filed by BRIAN HARGRAVE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by BRIAN HARGRAVE. (Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARGRAVE v. DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN HARGRAVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: SARAH K. DOUGLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?