DOUGLAS V. DEPUY ORTHOPAEIDCS, INC., ET AL.
Plaintiff: THOMAS LEE DOUGLAS
Defendant: DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC. and DEPUY SYNTHES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00848
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 ELECTRONIC TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS per MDL Order (CTO-324) re: MDL 2244: Transfer to the Northern District of Texas. (Taylor, Abby)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record. Re: Conditional Transfer Order transferring this case to the Northern District of Texas. (CTO-324). (Taylor, Abby)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-324) Re: MDL 2244 transferring this case to the Northern District of Texas for the reasons stated in the order of May 23, 2011, Received and filed on 10/08/2019. (Taylor, Abby)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to J)( Answer due 09/25/2019, Answer due 09/26/2019. PATRICK, MICHAEL)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC., MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 JJ, #2 JJ INTERNATIONAL, #3 DEPUY ORTHO, #4 DEPUY INC)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 21, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 21, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPUY SYNTHES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2635567.), filed by Thomas Lee Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PATRICK, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOUGLAS V. DEPUY ORTHOPAEIDCS, INC., ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY SYNTHES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS LEE DOUGLAS
Represented By: MICHAEL W. PATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?