ROBINETTE V. TESLA, INC.
Plaintiff: TAYLOR ROBINETTE
Defendant: TESLA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00905
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 10/28/2019. Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Docs. #6 , #8 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall arbitrate all causes of action asserted in the complaint. FURTHER that this action is STAYED. The parties are directed to report to the court no later than December 31, 2019, on the status of the arbitration or within fourteen days of any decision of the arbitrator that would affect the status of the present action, if the matter is resolved before December 31, 2019. (Daniel, J)
October 15, 2019 Motion Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. (Engle, Anita)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corrected document re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Retail Sales Installment Contract, #2 Exhibit B - New Vehicle Limited Warranty, #3 Exhibit C - NCDS Decision)(CLEARY, PATRICK)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to State Court of Filing Petition for Removal by Defendant TESLA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Durham County Clerk's Acknowledgement of Receipt of Notice of Removal)(CLEARY, PATRICK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by TESLA, INC.. Response to Motion due by 10/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit A (to Motion and Memo in Support) - Retail Sales Installment Contract, #3 Exhibit B (to Motion and Memo in Support) - New Vehicle Limited Warranty, #4 Exhibit C (to Motion and Memo in Support) NCDS Decision)(CLEARY, PATRICK)
September 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 6, 2019 Case assigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to TESLA, INC. (Original document issued in Durham County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS3431 on 07/16/2019 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against TESLA, INC., filed by TAYLOR ROBINETTE. (Original document filed in Durham County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS3431 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant Tesla, Inc. d/b/a Tesla Motor Company by Tesla, Inc. d/b/a Tesla Motor Company.(CLEARY, PATRICK)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Taylor Robinette ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2648036.)(Related Case # 19-CVS-003431), filed by Tesla, Inc. d/b/a Tesla Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(CLEARY, PATRICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBINETTE V. TESLA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYLOR ROBINETTE
Represented By: JACOB MATTHEW NORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TESLA, INC.
Represented By: PATRICK JAMES CLEARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?