UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. v. AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.
Defendant: AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00929
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 12/11/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (ORRISON, BRENDA)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. Answer due by 10/23/2019. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 9/20/2019 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Extension)(ORRISON, BRENDA)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent K2 INSURANCE SERVICES LLC, Corporate Parent AEGIS SECURITY INC for AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (ORRISON, BRENDA)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by all parties. Est. Trial Days: 3. (ORRISON, BRENDA)
September 10, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 10, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LUKE J. FARLEY on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. (FARLEY, LUKE)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. identifying Corporate Parent SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC... (CHAMBERLIN, ANDREW)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2650656.), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit B - Subcontract, #3 Exhibit C - Change Order, #4 Exhibit D - Invoices)(CHAMBERLIN, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. v. AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.
Represented By: LUKE J. FARLEY
Represented By: ANDREW S. CHAMBERLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BRENDA KREBS ORRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?