PRICE v. BH MEDIA GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KELLY YOUNG and GAYLA PRICE
Defendant: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC., BH MEDIA GROUP, INC., BH MEDIA NEWS & RECORD and GREENSBORO NEWS & RECORD, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00960
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER by GAYLA PRICE, KELLY YOUNG. (Butler, Carol)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GAYLA PRICE. BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019; BH MEDIA GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019; GREENSBORO NEWS & RECORD, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waivers of Service for BH Media Group, Inc and Greensboro News & Record, LLC)(EDWARDS, CATHARINE)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel Scott S. Moore on behalf of BH Media Group, Inc. and Greensboro News & Record, LLC on 10/03/2019. (EDWARDS, CATHARINE)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC., BH MEDIA GROUP, INC., BH MEDIA NEWS & RECORD, GREENSBORO NEWS & RECORD, LLC, KELLY YOUNG. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Individual and Class Action Complaint against defendant BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC., BH MEDIA GROUP, INC., KELLY YOUNG, GREENSBORO NEWS & RECORD, LLC, filed by GAYLA PRICE.(EDWARDS, CATHARINE)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
September 19, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 19, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Individual and Collective Action Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2657179.), filed by Gayla Price.(EDWARDS, CATHARINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRICE v. BH MEDIA GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BH MEDIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BH MEDIA NEWS & RECORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSBORO NEWS & RECORD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY YOUNG
Represented By: CATHARINE E. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAYLA PRICE
Represented By: CATHARINE E. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?