GAITHER, et al v. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: KEISHA MARIA GAITHER and WILLIAM ARTHUR GAITHER, JR.
Defendant: PHH CORPORATION, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C. and PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00970
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Case Management Track: Complex. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 12/4/2019. Defendant's Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 12/4/2019. Discovery due by 5/8/2020. Trial two to three days. Jury Trial demanded. (Butler, Carol)
November 14, 2019 TEXT ORDER adopting #11 Joint Rule 26(f) Report. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/14/2019. (AULD, L.)
November 13, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #11 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by KEISHA MARIA GAITHER, WILLIAM ARTHUR GAITHER, JR.(SHAPIRO, CRAIG)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/25/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C., PHH CORPORATION, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (SCRUGGS, MARY)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARY W. SCRUGGS on behalf of Defendants OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C., PHH CORPORATION, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION (SCRUGGS, MARY)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KEISHA MARIA GAITHER, WILLIAM ARTHUR GAITHER, JR as to PHH CORPORATION served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (SHAPIRO, CRAIG)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KEISHA MARIA GAITHER, WILLIAM ARTHUR GAITHER, JR as to PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (SHAPIRO, CRAIG)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KEISHA MARIA GAITHER, WILLIAM ARTHUR GAITHER, JR as to OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C. served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (SHAPIRO, CRAIG)
September 20, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C., PHH CORPORATION, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 PHH, #2 OCWEN)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CRAIG M. SHAPIRO on behalf of Plaintiffs Keisha Gaither, William Gaither (SHAPIRO, CRAIG)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2657774.), filed by William Gaither, Keisha Gaither.(SHAPIRO, CRAIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAITHER, et al v. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEISHA MARIA GAITHER
Represented By: CRAIG M. SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM ARTHUR GAITHER, JR.
Represented By: CRAIG M. SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH CORPORATION
Represented By: MARY W. SCRUGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C.
Represented By: MARY W. SCRUGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: MARY W. SCRUGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?