WILSON v. CHRYSLER CAPITAL, et al
Plaintiff: Tannya D Wilson and TANNYA D. WILSON
Defendant: Chrysler Capital, Equifax, TRANSUNION, Innovis Data Solutions and EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00975
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 11/14/2019. The motion to dismiss filed by defendant Equifax Information Services LLC (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED. The motion to dismiss filed by defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED. The motion to dismiss filed by defendant Innovis Data Solutions (Doc. #18 ) is GRANTED. The plaintiff Tannya Wilson is ORDERED to file proof of valid service on Chrysler Capital no later than December 23, 2019, and failure to comply subjects her complaint to dismissal without further notice. (Daniel, J)
November 4, 2019 Motions Submitted: #7 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #18 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM For Relief to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
October 14, 2019 Filing 23 Corrected document re #19 Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(SHOR, MICHAEL)
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JASON A. SPAK on behalf of Defendant INNOVIS DATA SOLUTIONS (SPAK, JASON)
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond re: #18 First MOTION TO DISMISS. (Daniel, J)
October 4, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INNOVIS DATA SOLUTIONS. (SHOR, MICHAEL)
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF re #18 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM For Relief by Defendant INNOVIS DATA SOLUTIONS filed by INNOVIS DATA SOLUTIONS. (SHOR, MICHAEL)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM For Relief by INNOVIS DATA SOLUTIONS. Response to Motion due by 10/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(SHOR, MICHAEL)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL L. SHOR on behalf of Defendant INNOVIS DATA SOLUTIONS (SHOR, MICHAEL)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. Amendment to #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Parent Company Disclosure)(ENLOE, CAREN)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSEPH W. WILLIFORD on behalf of Defendant TRANSUNION (WILLIFORD, JOSEPH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by TRANSUNION. (DEROSSET, ROBERT)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT COWAN DEROSSET, IV on behalf of Defendant TRANSUNION (DEROSSET, ROBERT)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond to #7 Joint Motion to Dismiss. (Daniel, J)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond to #4 Motion to Dismiss. (Daniel, J)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (ENLOE, CAREN)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANSUNION re #7 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANSUNION. (ENLOE, CAREN)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANSUNION. (ENLOE, CAREN)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant EQUIFAX (DAILEY, COLIN)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Unpublished Decisions))(DAILEY, COLIN)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by EQUIFAX. Response to Motion due by 10/24/2019 (DAILEY, COLIN)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
September 23, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TANNYA D. WILSON.(Original document filed in Lee County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS505 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Tannya D Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2658752.), filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lee County State Court Action)(ENLOE, CAREN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. CHRYSLER CAPITAL, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Represented By: COLIN D. W. DAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSUNION
Represented By: ROBERT COWAN DEROSSET, IV
Represented By: JOSEPH W. WILLIFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovis Data Solutions
Represented By: JASON A. SPAK
Represented By: MICHAEL L. SHOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: CAREN D. ENLOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tannya D Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANNYA D. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?