HILL, et al v. AQ TEXTILES LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dominique Morrison and Amy Hill
Defendant: Creative Textile Mills Pvt. Ltd. and AQ Textiles LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00983
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (RODENBOUGH, ANDREW)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AQ TEXTILES LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/12/2019 (RODENBOUGH, ANDREW)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RYAN C. FAIRCHILD on behalf of Defendant AQ TEXTILES LLC (FAIRCHILD, RYAN)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JENNIFER K. VAN ZANT on behalf of Defendant AQ TEXTILES LLC (VAN ZANT, JENNIFER)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for AQ TEXTILES LLC and CREATIVE TEXTILE MILLS PVT. LTD. Answer due by 11/22/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/24/2019. (Brubaker, John)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AQ TEXTILES LLC. (RODENBOUGH, ANDREW)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AQ TEXTILES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RODENBOUGH, ANDREW)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW L. RODENBOUGH on behalf of Defendant AQ TEXTILES LLC (RODENBOUGH, ANDREW)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to AQ TEXTILES LLC served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (HARRIS, SCOTT)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CREATIVE TEXTILE MILLS PVT. LTD. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL A. MCSHANE on behalf of Plaintiffs AMY HILL, DOMINIQUE MORRISON (MCSHANE, MICHAEL)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney S. CLINTON WOODS on behalf of Plaintiffs AMY HILL, DOMINIQUE MORRISON (WOODS, S.)
September 24, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AQ TEXTILES LLC. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AQ Textiles LLC, Creative Textile Mills Pvt. Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2660050.), filed by Amy Hill, Dominique Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(HARRIS, SCOTT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL, et al v. AQ TEXTILES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Morrison
Represented By: SCOTT C. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL A. MCSHANE
Represented By: S. CLINTON WOODS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Hill
Represented By: SCOTT C. HARRIS
Represented By: MICHAEL A. MCSHANE
Represented By: S. CLINTON WOODS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Textile Mills Pvt. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQ Textiles LLC
Represented By: RYAN C. FAIRCHILD
Represented By: JENNIFER K. VAN ZANT
Represented By: ANDREW L. RODENBOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?