ROCKINGHAM CASUALTY COMPANY v. TANNER BUILT HOMES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ROCKINGHAM CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: TANNER BUILT HOMES, LLC and CLAUDIA CRESON
Case Number: 1:2019cv01009
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Case Reported Settled by Plaintiff's Counsel, Robert M. Kennedy, Jr. Stipulation of Dismissal due by 12/21/2019. (Welch, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for TANNER BUILT HOMES, LLC. Answer due by 11/20/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/21/2019. (Brubaker, John)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by TANNER BUILT HOMES, LLC. (WARD, JONATHAN)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN PAUL WARD on behalf of Defendant TANNER BUILT HOMES, LLC (WARD, JONATHAN)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for CLAUDIA CRESON. Answer due by 11/18/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/10/2019. (Brubaker, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CLAUDIA CRESON. (MEISTER, EMILY)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EMILY JEFFORDS MEISTER on behalf of Defendant CLAUDIA CRESON (MEISTER, EMILY)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT MILLS KENNEDY, JR on behalf of Plaintiff ROCKINGHAM CASUALTY COMPANY (KENNEDY, ROBERT)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TANNER BUILT HOMES, LLC, CLAUDIA CRESON. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Claudia Creson) (Sheets, Jamie)
September 30, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockingham Casualty Company. (KENNEDY, ROBERT)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2663355.), filed by Rockingham Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Poe Report, #2 Exhibit 2- Triad Remodeling, Inc. Report, #3 Exhibit 3- Policy, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(KENNEDY, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROCKINGHAM CASUALTY COMPANY v. TANNER BUILT HOMES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TANNER BUILT HOMES, LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN PAUL WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAUDIA CRESON
Represented By: EMILY JEFFORDS MEISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCKINGHAM CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT MILLS KENNEDY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?