UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SCHNEIDER et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: TERESA DENISE SCHNEIDER, FRED DOUGLAS PERKINS, JR., THOMAS P SCHNEIDER, FRED DOUGLAS PERKINS, TERESA P. PERKINS, TERESA D. PERKINS, TERESA D. SCHNEIDER and THOMAS P. SCHNEIDER
Case Number: 1:2019cv01059
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:3301
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail of Summons, Amended Complaint and Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before a U. S. Magistrate Judge as to TERESA DENISE SCHNEIDER served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (CHILDS, JOAN)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(CHILDS, JOAN)
November 20, 2019 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Because #7 Answer to #1 Complaint was filed on 11/19/2019, the United States may amend #1 Complaint as a matter of course until 12/10/2019, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1). Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/20/2019. (AULD, L.)
November 20, 2019 Motion Referred: RE: #8 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #8 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Amended Complaint)(CHILDS, JOAN)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Response to Motion due by 12/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CHILDS, JOAN)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by THOMAS P SCHNEIDER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Butler, Carol) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2019: #2 Envelope - Front and Back) (Butler, Carol).
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to TERESA DENISE SCHNEIDER served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (CHILDS, JOAN)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to FRED DOUGLAS PERKINS, JR served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (CHILDS, JOAN)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to THOMAS P SCHNEIDER served on 10/19/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (CHILDS, JOAN)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TERESA DENISE SCHNEIDER, THOMAS P SCHNEIDER, FRED DOUGLAS PERKINS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Thomas Schneider, #2 Summons - Fred Perkins, Jr.) (Sheets, Jamie)
October 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Related Case # 1:18CR228-1), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(CHILDS, JOAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SCHNEIDER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA DENISE SCHNEIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRED DOUGLAS PERKINS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS P SCHNEIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRED DOUGLAS PERKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA P. PERKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA D. PERKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA D. SCHNEIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS P. SCHNEIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOAN BRODISH CHILDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?