FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY v. AMBROSE, et al
Plaintiff: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: JEFFREY AMBROSE, TRACEY THORNBURG ANDERSON, JACOB AMBROSE, JENNIFER AMBROSE, AUSTIN AMBROSE, RODNEY DALE HAITHCOCK and EVAN LEE DEFORGE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01107
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to JEFFREY AMBROSE a/k/a AUSTIN AMBROSE. (Sheets, Jamie)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to JACOB AMBROSE served on 11/9/2019, answer due 12/2/2019; JEFFREY AMBROSE served on 11/9/2019, answer due 12/2/2019; JENNIFER AMBROSE served on 11/9/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Jacob Ambrose, #2 Affidavit of Service for Jennifer Ambrose)(SIMPSON, GEORGE)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JEFFREY AMBROSE, JENNIFER AMBROSE, JACOB AMBROSE. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Jennifer Ambrose, #2 Summons - Jacob Ambrose) (Sheets, Jamie)
November 4, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
November 4, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY. (SIMPSON, GEORGE)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GEORGE L. SIMPSON, IV on behalf of Plaintiff FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY (SIMPSON, GEORGE)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against JACOB AMBROSE, JEFFREY AMBROSE, JENNIFER AMBROSE, TRACEY THORNBURG ANDERSON, EVAN LEE DEFORGE, ESTATE OF COLBEY DALE EDMON HAITHCOCK, RODNEY DALE HAITHCOCK, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2687473), filed by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration Page and Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Police Report, #4 Exhibit C - letter from atty Albright to Foremost) (SIMPSON, GEORGE) Modified on 11/4/2019 to remove duplicate text. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY v. AMBROSE, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY AMBROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACEY THORNBURG ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACOB AMBROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER AMBROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTIN AMBROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODNEY DALE HAITHCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVAN LEE DEFORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GEORGE L. SIMPSON, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?