UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY $6,728.00 IN U.S.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CURRENCY $6,728.00 IN U.S.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01136
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE NON-PARTY on December 27, 2019 via certified mail with the Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice as to Jamal Trevon Edwards (STRUP, NATHAN)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE NON-PARTY on December 27, 2019 via certified mail with the Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice as to Raekwon Marquis Brinkley (STRUP, NATHAN)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE NON-PARTY on December 26, 2019 via certified mail with the Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice as to Favour Chimdindu Chuckwu (STRUP, NATHAN)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 USMS Return Executed for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice served on defendant property $6,782.00 in U.S. Currency on December 23, 2019, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (STRUP, NATHAN)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 11/19/2019. Certified copy forwarded to USAO. (Sheets, Jamie)
November 15, 2019 Case Assigned to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Butler, Carol)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Warrant for Arrest (), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STRUP, NATHAN)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against CURRENCY $6,728.00 IN U.S. (Filing fee.), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(STRUP, NATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY $6,728.00 IN U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURRENCY $6,728.00 IN U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: NATHAN L. STRUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?