CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY and SIERRA CLUB
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL
Case Number: 1:2019cv01179
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7523
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 3/18/2020 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL. (MCGRATH, PETER)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL. Answer due by 1/29/2020. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/20/2019. (Brubaker, John)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(MCGRATH, PETER)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PETER J. MCGRATH, JR on behalf of Defendant UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL (MCGRATH, PETER)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DE JONG, PERRIN)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT UKEILEY on behalf of Plaintiffs CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, SIERRA CLUB (UKEILEY, ROBERT)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRIDGET M. LEE on behalf of Plaintiff SIERRA CLUB (LEE, BRIDGET)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
December 3, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for injunctive and declaratory relief against UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2705969.), filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 1: Plaintiffs' Attorneys, #3 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement of Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity, #4 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement of Plaintiff Sierra Club) (DE JONG, PERRIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL
Represented By: PETER J. MCGRATH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: PERRIN W. DE JONG
Represented By: ROBERT UKEILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: PERRIN W. DE JONG
Represented By: BRIDGET M. LEE
Represented By: ROBERT UKEILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?