JAMES v. SPECTRUM
Plaintiff: JOANN JAMES
Defendant: SPECTRUM
Case Number: 1:2019cv01199
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT Signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/30/2019; For the reasons set forth in the Order filed contemporaneously with this Judgment; that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Hicks, Samantha)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/30/2019 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Text Recommendation; that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Hicks, Samantha)
December 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER RE: TEXT ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION dated 12/13/2019. (Engle, Anita)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION TO RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Plaintiff JOANN JAMES. Response to Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Butler, Carol)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 12/27/2019. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 12/30/2019. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Motion for Application to Proceed IFP for limited purpose of recommending dismissal. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/13/2019. See 12/13/2019 Text order. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 13, 2019 TEXT ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION granting #1 Application to Proceed IFP for the limited purpose of recommending dismissal of #2 Complaint for want of subject matter jurisdiction. In #2 Complaint, Plaintiff purports to invoke this Court's diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. s 1332, but alleges an amount in controversy of only $241.56, far short of the required $75,000 threshold under Section 1332. Nor does #2 Complaint reveal any other plausible basis for federal jurisdiction over any claim asserted by Plaintiff. Accordingly, the Court should dismiss #2 Complaint for want of subject matter jurisdiction. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/13/2019. (AULD, L.)
December 11, 2019 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 10, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Sheets, Jamie)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against SPECTRUM, filed by JOANN JAMES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spectrum Documents, #2 Exhibit Bankruptcy Documents, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Envelope - Front and Back) (Sheets, Jamie)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by JOANN JAMES. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMES v. SPECTRUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECTRUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANN JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?