JAMES v. MOYIHAN et al
Plaintiff: JOANN JAMES
Defendant: ANDREW BERNARDINI and BRIAN MOYIHAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01235
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 (Letter) NOTICE by JOANN JAMES of Voluntary Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Daniel, J)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Mailing Recommendation: Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2020. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 1/6/2020. (Hicks, Samantha)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Motion for Application to Proceed IFP for limited purpose of recommending dismissal. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/19/2019. See 12/19/2019 Text order. (Hicks, Samantha)
December 19, 2019 TEXT ORDER and RECOMMENDATION granting #1 Application to Proceed IFP for the limited purpose of recommending dismissal of #2 Complaint for want of subject matter jurisdiction. In #2 Complaint, Plaintiff purports to invoke this Court's diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. s 1332, but alleges (A) that Plaintiff and Defendants all reside in North Carolina (such that complete diversity of citizenship as required under Section 1332 does not exist) and (B) that the case involves an amount in controversy of only $14,945.02 (far short of the required $75,000 threshold under Section 1332). Nor does #2 Complaint reveal any other plausible basis for federal jurisdiction over any claim asserted by Plaintiff. Accordingly, the Court should dismiss #2 Complaint for want of subject matter jurisdiction. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/19/2019. (AULD, L.)
December 19, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha)
December 19, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW BERNARDINI, BRIAN MOYIHAN filed by JOANN JAMES. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Other Court Documents, #3 Envelope)(Hicks, Samantha)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by JOANN JAMES. (Hicks, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMES v. MOYIHAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANN JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW BERNARDINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN MOYIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?