WARD v. SAUL
Plaintiff: TINA KAYE WARD
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01239
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to ANDREW SAUL served on 12/26/2019, answer due 2/24/2020. as to (Attachments: #1 proof of service)(PATTON, AMELIA)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent - SSA. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Hicks, Samantha)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/20/2019; that Plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service upon each defendant, including the correct address and the name and title of the individual to be served on behalf of a corporation, association, infant, incompetent, or government agency. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the complaint and summons upon each defendant.(Hicks, Samantha)
December 20, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha)
December 20, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TINA KAYE WARD. (Attachments: #1 Marriage Certificate, #2 former ID, #3 current ID)(PATTON, AMELIA)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by TINA KAYE WARD. (PATTON, AMELIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARD v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA KAYE WARD
Represented By: AMELIA N. PATTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?